American Mortgage Investment Partners Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Capito et al
Plaintiff: American Mortgage Investment Partners Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: New Mexico Mortgage Finance Authority, FNU LNU and Jaimie Capito
Case Number: 1:2018cv00987
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2018 Filing 4 Disclaimer of Interest ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New Mexico Mortgage Finance Authority. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Christiana Trust as Trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities Trust V.(Bousliman, Jason)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Mortgage Investment Partners Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. New Mexico Mortgage Finance Authority served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Walters, Ryan)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Foreclosure against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by American Mortgage Investment Partners Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, D/B/A Christiana Trust as Trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities Trust V. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Walters, Ryan)
October 23, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6093745 re #1 Complaint, filed by American Mortgage Investment Partners Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, D/B/A Christiana Trust as Trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities Trust V (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walters, Ryan)
October 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Jaimie Capito, New Mexico Mortgage Finance Authority. (kdh)
October 23, 2018 Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (kdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Mortgage Investment Partners Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Capito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Mortgage Finance Authority
Represented By: Jason C Bousliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaimie Capito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Mortgage Investment Partners Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Ryan M Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?