Roibal-Bradley v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Juanita Roibal-Bradley
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv01070
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Defendant United States of America. United States of America shall file an a response to the Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody by 1/18/2019. (bjp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by United States of America. (Kastrin, Holland)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Memorandum in Support, #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Mail sent to Juanit Roibal-Bradley (vv)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Juanita Roibal-Bradley. (ln)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Respondents are ordered to answer the Petition by 12/20/2018. (bjp)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for home confinement and for furlough by Juanita Roibal-Bradley. (vv)
November 16, 2018 United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (ln)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Juanita Roibal-Bradley. (ln)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Juanita Roibal-Bradley. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roibal-Bradley v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Roibal-Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Holland S. Kastrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?