May v. Judd et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Everett May and Joshua May
Defendant: M. Ortiz, G. Franco, B. Judd and S. Woodard
Case Number: 1:2018cv01109
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue by Joshua May. (meq)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend by Joshua May. (meq)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 Letter by Joshua May (meq)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Responses due by 1/15/2019 (correcting caption). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are excused from all filing obligations, including responding to one anothers submissions, until further Order by the Court. Once screening is complete, the Court will enter a separate order either dismissing the Complaint or setting additional deadlines. (ccp)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Responses due by 1/15/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are excused from all filing obligations, including responding to one anothers submissions, until further Order by the Court. Once screening is complete, the Court will enter a separate order either dismissing the Complaint or setting additional deadlines. (ccp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Appoint Counsel by B. Judd. (Lee, Jacob)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joshua May. (meq)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joshua May. (meq)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by B. Judd. (Lee, Jacob)
November 29, 2018 Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
November 29, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6156494 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by B. Judd (Warden) (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lee, Jacob)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by B. Judd (Warden) ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by B. Judd (Warden). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Main, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint (13th Judicial), #4 Exhibit 2 - 13th Judicial Filings, #5 Exhibit 3 - 13th Judicial Notice of Filing Removal)(Lee, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Judd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ortiz
Represented By: Paula E. Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Franco
Represented By: Paula E. Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Judd
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Represented By: Deborah D. Wells
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Everett May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?