Dendy v. Chartrand et al.
Plaintiff: Lisa Dendy
Defendant: Michael J. Chartrand, Michelle Irene Chartrand, Jane Does 1-10 and Jane Does
Case Number: 1:2018cv01118
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on Which the Court May Grant Relief filed by Michael J. Chartrand, Michelle Irene Chartrand. (Feuchter, Benjamin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on Which the Court May Grant Relief filed by Lisa Dendy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Childress, Sidney)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on Which the Court May Grant Relief by Michael J. Chartrand, Michelle Irene Chartrand. (Feuchter, Benjamin)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 30, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
November 30, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6159475 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Michael J. Chartrand (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Feuchter, Benjamin)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from State of New Mexico County of Sandoval, case number D-1329-CV-2018-02325. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (Feuchter, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dendy v. Chartrand et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Dendy
Represented By: Sidney Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Chartrand
Represented By: Ellen A Geske
Represented By: Benjamin F Feuchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Irene Chartrand
Represented By: Ellen A Geske
Represented By: Benjamin F Feuchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?