Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al

Petitioner: Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association and Otero County Cattleman's Association
Respondent: Greg Sheehan and United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv01138
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association, Otero County Cattleman's Association. Greg Sheehan served on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019; United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Francois, Anthony)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 On December 27, 2018, the Chief Judge of this district filed a "Temporary Administrative Order Relating to Civil Cases Involving the United States." See In Re Civil Proceedings Involving the United States During Federal Lapse in Appropriations, 18-MC-00004-55 and 18-MC-00035-02 (D.N.M.). This order imposed a temporary stay in "all civil cases within the District of New Mexico wherein the United States or an agency, corporation, officer or employee, deemed or otherwise, of the United States is a party[.]" Id. 3. The order also extended all deadlines in affected cases "for a period of time commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations, but in no case beyond January 16, 2019, absent further Order of the Court." Id. Consequently, because this civil case involves as a party the United States or an agency thereof, this case is TEMPORARILY STAYED pending further order of this Court. All current deadlines will be EXTENDED by the number of days that elapse between today's date and the lifting of the temporary stay. So ordered. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (hm)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association, Otero County Cattleman's Association re 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING (Dunn, A.)
December 17, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6186555 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Otero County Cattleman's Association, Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schiff, Damien)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Petitioners Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association, Otero County Cattleman's Association by Damien M. Schiff (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schiff, Damien)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 17, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6186539 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Otero County Cattleman's Association, Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McCoy, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Petitioners Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association, Otero County Cattleman's Association by Jeffrey McCoy (Association Dues - Online Payment) (McCoy, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to Greg Sheehan, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mnb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (mnb)
December 6, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6168499 re #1 Complaint, filed by Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association, Otero County Cattlemen's Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Francois, Anthony)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Petition for Review against Greg Sheehan, United States Fish and Wildlife Service ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association, Otero County Cattlemen's Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Francois, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northern New Mexico Stockman's Association
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Damien M. Schiff
Represented By: Jeffrey McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Otero County Cattleman's Association
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Damien M. Schiff
Represented By: Jeffrey McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?