Brick v. Estancia Municipal School District et al

Plaintiff: Tisha Brick
Defendant: New Mexico Public Education Department, Vanessa Gutierrez, Evelyn Howard-Hand, State of New Mexico, Ray Sharbatt, Mico Fernandez, Estancia Municipal School District, Stephanie Reynolds, Lorie Gerkey and The Office of Civil Rights
Case Number: 1:2018cv01143
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 Defendant Estancia Municipal School District's REPLY to Plaintiff's Objection to Its Concurring Motion to Dismiss re #21 Objections filed by Estancia Municipal School District. (German, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2019 Filing 24 Opposed MOTION to Seal Document Motion to File the Due Process Hearing Administrative Record Under Seal by Estancia Municipal School District. (German, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2019 Filing 23 OBJECTION to EMSD Defendants Motion and Proposed Order to File the Due Process Hearing Administrative Record Under Seal by Tisha Brick. (gr)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTIONS by Tisha Brick to #17 Response to Motion and #18 Reply to Response to Motion. (mjr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Darin Andrew Childers on behalf of Lorie Gerkey, Evelyn Howard-Hand (Childers, Darin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lorie Gerkey, Evelyn Howard-Hand re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Evelyn Howard-Hand, Lorie Gerkey (Childers, Darin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lorie Gerkey, Evelyn Howard-Hand. (Childers, Darin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Estancia Municipal School District. (German, Elizabeth)
December 31, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE (Objections) to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tisha Brick. (mjr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lorie Gerkey, Evelyn Howard-Hand. (Ziegler, John)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John K Ziegler on behalf of Lorie Gerkey, Evelyn Howard-Hand (Ziegler, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Estancia Municipal School District of Unavailability from March 27, 2019 to March 29, 2019 (German, Elizabeth) Modified text on 12/20/2018 add dates (gr).
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Estancia Municipal School District as to Estancia Municipal School District. (German, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Estancia Municipal School District as to Estancia Municipal School District. (German, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. German on behalf of Estancia Municipal School District (German, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 CM/ECF PRO SE NOTIFICATION FORM by Tisha Brick (jg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Electronic Filing by Tisha Brick. (jg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Tisha Brick (jg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tisha Brick. (mnb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (mnb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tisha Brick. (mnb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2018: #1 Rescanned Complaint containing all pages) (mnb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brick v. Estancia Municipal School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Public Education Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Howard-Hand
Represented By: Darin Andrew Childers
Represented By: John K Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Sharbatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mico Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estancia Municipal School District
Represented By: Mary Keleher Castle
Represented By: Elizabeth L. German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Gerkey
Represented By: Darin Andrew Childers
Represented By: John K Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of Civil Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?