Lovelace Health System, Inc. et al v. Azar

Plaintiff: Lovelace Health System, Inc. d/b/a Lovelace Rehabilitation Hospital, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC and Lovelace Health System Inc.
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar and Alex M. Azar
Case Number: 1:2018cv01149
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 On December 27, 2018, the Chief Judge of this district filed a "Temporary Administrative Order Relating to Civil Cases Involving the United States." See In Re Civil Proceedings Involving the United States During Federal Lapse in Appropriations, 18-MC-00004-55 and 18-MC-00035-02 (D.N.M.). This order imposed a temporary stay in "all civil cases within the District of New Mexico wherein the United States or an agency, corporation, officer or employee, deemed or otherwise, of the United States is a party[.]" Id. 3. The order also extended all deadlines in affected cases "for a period of time commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations, but in no case beyond January 16, 2019, absent further Order of the Court." Id. Consequently, because this civil case involves as a party the United States or an agency thereof, this case is TEMPORARILY STAYED pending further order of this Court. All current deadlines will be EXTENDED by the number of days that elapse between today's date and the lifting of the temporary stay. So ordered. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
December 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mnb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, Lovelace Health System Inc. re 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Certification in Support (Jackson, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (mnb)
December 7, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6172147 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lovelace Health System, Inc. d/b/a Lovelace Rehabilitation Hospital, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jackson, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, Lovelace Health System, Inc. d/b/a Lovelace Rehabilitation Hospital by Matthew Eric Jackson on behalf of: Daniel J. Hettich King & Spalding LLP 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 200Washington, DC 20006 202-737-0500 Fax 202-626-3737 dhettich@kslaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Jackson, Matthew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, Lovelace Health System, Inc. d/b/a Lovelace Rehabilitation Hospital identifying Corporate Parent AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc. for Lovelace Health System, Inc. d/b/a Lovelace Rehabilitation Hospital; Corporate Parent AHS Hillcrest Healthcare System, LLC for AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC. (Jackson, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6172005 re #1 Complaint, filed by Lovelace Health System, Inc. d/b/a Lovelace Rehabilitation Hospital, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jackson, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Lovelace Health System, Inc. d/b/a Lovelace Rehabilitation Hospital, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovelace Health System, Inc. et al v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovelace Health System, Inc. d/b/a Lovelace Rehabilitation Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Eric Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Eric Jackson
Represented By: Daniel J Hettich
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovelace Health System Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Eric Jackson
Represented By: Daniel J Hettich
Represented By: Charles Robert Peifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?