In Re: $323,647.60 in Funds Belonging to the California Valley Miwok Tribe

Plaintiff: Ramah Navajo Chapter, Pueblo of Zuni and Oglala Sioux Tribe
Defendant: Sally Jewell
In Re: $323,647.60 in Funds Belonging to the California Valley Miwok Tribe
Interpleader: California Valley Miwok Tribe, Velma White Bear, Gilbert Ramirez, Jr., Antonia Lopez, Teresa Gonzalez, Michael Mendibles, Silvia Burley, Antoinette Lopez, Yakima Dixie and Iva Carsoner
Case Number: 1:2018cv01194
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Karen B Molzen
Referring Judge: James A Parker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Velma White Bear, California Valley Miwok Tribe, Iva Carsoner, Yakima Dixie, Teresa Gonzalez, Antoinette Lopez, Antonia Lopez, Michael Mendibles, Gilbert Ramirez, Jr re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Gilbert Ramirez, Jr., Velma White Bear, Yakima Dixie, Michael Mendibles, Antoinette Lopez, Iva Carsoner, California Valley Miwok Tribe, Antonia Lopez (Rusk, James)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Velma White Bear, California Valley Miwok Tribe, Iva Carsoner, Yakima Dixie, Teresa Gonzalez, Antoinette Lopez, Antonia Lopez, Michael Mendibles, Gilbert Ramirez, Jr. (Rusk, James)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Silvia Burley, California Valley Miwok Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Manuel Corrales, Jr., #2 Declaration of Silvia Burley) (Corrales, Manuel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay (Motion to Lift Stay) filed by Silvia Burley, California Valley Miwok Tribe. (Corrales, Manuel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay (Motion to Lift Stay) filed by Velma White Bear, California Valley Miwok Tribe, Iva Carsoner, Yakima Dixie, Antoinette Lopez, Antonia Lopez, Michael Mendibles, Gilbert Ramirez, Jr. (Rusk, James)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of California by Velma White Bear, California Valley Miwok Tribe, Iva Carsoner, Yakima Dixie, Antoinette Lopez, Antonia Lopez, Michael Mendibles, Gilbert Ramirez, Jr. (Rusk, James) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (bap).
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of California pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) by Velma White Bear, California Valley Miwok Tribe, Iva Carsoner, Yakima Dixie, Antoinette Lopez, Antonia Lopez, Michael Mendibles, Gilbert Ramirez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Declaration of A Lopez, #3 Exhibit Declaration of James Rusk) (Rusk, James) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (bap).
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay (Motion to Lift Stay) by Silvia Burley, California Valley Miwok Tribe. (Corrales, Manuel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #2 Complaint in Interpleader by Defendants-In-Interpleaders California Valley Miwok Tribe, The General Council and Silva Burley*** This was filed on 1/6/2017 as doc. 1395 in 90cv957 *** (bap)
December 19, 2018 District Judge James A. Parker and Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (kdh)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting Defendants-in-Interpleader's #5 Joint Motion to Stay pending final decision by the Department of the Interior recognizing a government for the Tribe or until further order of the Court. **This was filed as doc. 1416 on 2/13/17 in 90cv957*** (bap)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT by Ramah Navajo Chapter of Non-Opposition to Defendant-In-Interpleader's Notice of Motion and Unopposed Joint Motion for Stay of Interpleader Action Against California Valley Miwok Tribe (Gross, Michael) **This was filed as doc. 1409 on 1/27/17 in 90cv957*** (bap)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion and Unopposed Joint Motion to Stay Complaint-in-Interpleader by Velma White Bear, Silvia Burley, California Valley Miwok Tribe, Iva Carsoner, Yakima Dixie, Antoinette Lopez, Antonia Lopez, Michael Mendibles, Gilbert Ramirez, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS-IN-INTERPLEADERS UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF INTERPLEADER ACTION AGAINST CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, # 2 UNOPPOSED DECLARATION OF JAMES RUSK IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF INTERPLEADER ACTION AGAINST CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, # 3 Exhibit A to Unopposed Declaration of James Rusk) (Rusk, James) **This was filed as doc. 1407 on 1/24/17 in 90cv957*** (bap)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ramah Navajo Chapter as to California Valley Miwok Tribe. (Gross, Michael) **This was filed as doc. 1389 on 12/14/16 in 90cv957** (bap)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ramah Navajo Chapter as to California Valley Miwok Tribe by (Gross, Michael) **This was filed as doc. 1386 on 12/14/16 in 90cv957** (bap)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against California Valley Miwok Tribe, Velma White Bear, Silvia Burley, Iva Carsoner, Yakima Dixie, Teresa Gonzalez, Antoinette Lopez, Antonia Lopez, Michael Mendibles, Gilbert Ramirez, Jr, filed by Ramah Navajo Chapter, Oglala Sioux Tribe and Pueblo of Zuni. **This was filed 9/29/16 as doc. 1366 in 90cv957 ***(bap)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER SEVERING California Valley Niwok Tribe Interpleader Action and Designating Separate Caption and Case Number (FILED in 90cv957 JAP-KB) as doc. 1622 by Senior District Judge James A. Parker. (bap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: $323,647.60 in Funds Belonging to the California Valley Miwok Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramah Navajo Chapter
Represented By: C. Bryant Rogers
Represented By: Michael P. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pueblo of Zuni
Represented By: Michael P. Gross
Represented By: Lloyd B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oglala Sioux Tribe
Represented By: C. Bryant Rogers
Represented By: Michael P. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: $323,647.60 in Funds Belonging to the California Valley Miwok Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: California Valley Miwok Tribe
Represented By: Manuel Corrales, Jr.
Represented By: Robert J. Uram
Represented By: James Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Velma White Bear
Represented By: Robert J. Uram
Represented By: James Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Gilbert Ramirez, Jr.
Represented By: Robert J. Uram
Represented By: James Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Antonia Lopez
Represented By: Robert J. Uram
Represented By: James Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Teresa Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Michael Mendibles
Represented By: Robert J. Uram
Represented By: James Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Silvia Burley
Represented By: Manuel Corrales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Antoinette Lopez
Represented By: Robert J. Uram
Represented By: James Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Yakima Dixie
Represented By: Robert J. Uram
Represented By: James Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Iva Carsoner
Represented By: Robert J. Uram
Represented By: James Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?