Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety et al v. City of Santa Fe, et al

Plaintiff: Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Arthur Firstenberg and Monika Steinhoff
Defendant: Hector Balderas, United States of America and City of Santa Fe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01209
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: Karen B Molzen
3 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 7/8/2019 Replies due by 8/1/2019. (plp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION to Dismiss by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. (Prlich, Kathleen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety re #48 Reply to Response to Motion (Prlich, Kathleen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Prlich, Kathleen)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter finding good cause, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), to delay entering a Scheduling Order at this time due to the pending dispositive motion. (plp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Ehrlich, Stephen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Partial Opposition re #43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Arthur Firstenberg. (jjs)
May 9, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety (Prlich, Kathleen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. (Mannick, Paul)
April 18, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Mannick on behalf of Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff (Mannick, Paul)
April 17, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Mannick on behalf of Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety (Mannick, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by Hector Balderas.(Granata, Joshua)
April 14, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff re #21 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Santa Fe (Prlich, Kathleen)
April 10, 2019 Filing 38 Plaintiffs Surreply to City of Santa Fes Amended Motion to Dismiss (jjs)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying in part and granting in part #27 Motion to Strike City of Santa Fe's Overlong Reply Brief or to Grant Plaintiffs' Leave to File a Surreply. (tah)
April 6, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff re #25 Reply to Response to Motion Notice of No Objection to Filing of Surreply (Prlich, Kathleen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 28 and 29. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
March 28, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Strike #25 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by City of Santa Fe. (Martinez, Marcos)
March 26, 2019 Filing 33 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
March 22, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Ehrlich on behalf of United States of America (Ehrlich, Stephen)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America Answer due 5/31/2019. (plp)
March 21, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by United States of America re #23 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Amended Complaint, (Currie, Cassandra)
March 19, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike #25 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss, MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Surreply) (Prlich, Kathleen)
March 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ccp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Santa Fe. (Martinez, Marcos)
March 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra C Currie on behalf of United States of America (Currie, Cassandra)
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Amended Complaint, by United States of America. (Currie, Cassandra)
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. (Prlich, Kathleen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 21 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Santa Fe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Martinez, Marcos)
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by United States of America of Entry of Order Lifting Stay (Attachments: #1 Order) (Hoses, Michael)
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Prlich, Kathleen)
January 29, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. (Prlich, Kathleen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William N Sosis on behalf of Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff (Sosis, William)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent notice must be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by United States of America of Entry of Administrative Order Staying Case (Attachments: #1 Order) (Hoses, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Santa Fe's answer due 1/15/2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mlt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Santa Fe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Martinez, Marcos)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by City of Santa Fe. (Martinez, Marcos)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hector Balderas answer due 2/19/2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mlt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Hector Balderas. (Granata, Joshua)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Granata on behalf of Hector Balderas (Granata, Joshua)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. United States of America served on 12/26/2018. (Prlich, Kathleen)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. Hector Balderas served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Prlich, Kathleen)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. City of Santa Fe served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Prlich, Kathleen)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Diane Tapia, for U.S. Attorney for the District of NM, and mailed to US Attorney General on 12/26/2018, filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. (Prlich, Kathleen) Modified on 12/31/2018, attorney to re-file as summons returned executed and include page 1(mnb).
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Daniel Rios, Intake Advocate for Hector Balderas on 12/21/2018, filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Monika Steinhoff. (Prlich, Kathleen) Modified on 12/31/2018, attorney to re-file as summons returned executed and include page 1(mnb).
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Xavier Vigil, for City of Santa Fe on 12/21/2018, filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety. (Prlich, Kathleen) Modified on 12/31/2018, attorney to re-file as summons returned executed and include page 1(mnb).
December 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States of America c/o John Anderson U.S. Attorney for the District of New Mexico.(ln)
December 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to Hector Balderas and City of Santa Fe. (ln)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
December 21, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (ln)
December 21, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6195984 re #1 Complaint, filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Prlich, Kathleen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Prlich, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety et al v. City of Santa Fe, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Joshua R. Granata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Cassandra C Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety
Represented By: Kathleen Prlich
Represented By: William N Sosis
Represented By: Paul D. Mannick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Firstenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Steinhoff
Represented By: Kathleen Prlich
Represented By: Paul D. Mannick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?