Kearney v. Unsecured Creditors Committee et al

Appellee: Benjamin Abruzzo, Louis Abruzzo, US Trustee, Unsecured Creditors Committee and Kevin Yearout
Appellant: Victor P Kearney
Case Number: 1:2018cv01223
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
1 Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Appellant's Opening Brief due by 4/23/2019. Appellees' Response Brief due by 6/7/2019. Appellant's Reply Brief, if any, due by 6/27/2019. (kmt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's Certificate of Service of Transmission of Record on Appeal and Index to Record on Appeal by US Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Received in Volume 7 of 7 volumes. (Butler, Linda)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Received in Volume 6 of 7 volumes. (Butler, Linda)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Received in Volume 5 of 7 volumes. (Butler, Linda)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Received in Volume 3 of 7 volumes. (Butler, Linda)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Received in Volume 2 of 7 volumes. (Butler, Linda)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Received in Volume 1 of 7 volumes. (Butler, Linda)
December 27, 2018 District Judge Martha Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (kdh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 Clerk's Certificate of Service by US Bankruptcy Court (Merewether, Lana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearney v. Unsecured Creditors Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Benjamin Abruzzo
Represented By: Paul M. Fish
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Louis Abruzzo
Represented By: Paul M. Fish
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Trustee
Represented By: Alice Nystel Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unsecured Creditors Committee
Represented By: Chris W. Pierce
Represented By: Thomas D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kevin Yearout
Represented By: James A. Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Victor P Kearney
Represented By: Marcus A. Helt
Represented By: Debbie E. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?