Stout v. City of Albuquerque

Plaintiff: Regina Stout
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Case Number: 1:2018cv01228
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Laura Fashing
1 Judge: Judith C Herrera
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 ERRATA re #17 Reply to Response to Motion, #9 First MOTION to Remand by Regina Stout (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Vega Lynn, Rosario)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by City of Albuquerque re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum filed by City of Albuquerque (Burnette, Jason)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum filed by City of Albuquerque. (Burnette, Jason)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Regina Stout re #9 First MOTION to Remand filed by Regina Stout (Vega Lynn, Rosario)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Remand filed by Regina Stout. (Vega Lynn, Rosario)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to extend deadline for Defendant to Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Plaintiff to Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Remand by City of Albuquerque (Burnette, Jason)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum, #12 Notice (Other) filed by Regina Stout. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AFSCME CBA, #2 Exhibit Citys Answer to PPC LB 16-33, #3 Exhibit LMRO, #4 Exhibit CABQ 3-1-27, #5 Exhibit MSO at 3-1-24(D)(2)(b)) (Vega Lynn, Rosario)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Remand filed by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D) (Burnette, Jason)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Transmittal of State Court Documents Certified Copy of State Court file by City of Albuquerque (Burnette, Jason)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Regina Stout re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum Parties Agreement To Exceed Exhibit Page Limits To Plaintiffs Response (Vega Lynn, Rosario)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending dispositive motions (Docs. 9 and 10). Accordingly, the telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque, and all associated deadlines, is VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D) (Burnette, Jason)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand by Regina Stout. (Vega Lynn, Rosario)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 2/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 2/12/2019. (pv)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Albuquerque (Burnette, Jason)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
December 27, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6200905 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by City of Albuquerque (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burnette, Jason)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 27, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Albuquerque of Notice of Filing of Removal (Burnette, Jason)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Albuquerque from Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2018-08197. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Burnette, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stout v. City of Albuquerque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Stout
Represented By: Rosario D Vega Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: Jason Michael Burnette
Represented By: Melissa Marie Kountz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?