In Re: Gold King Mine Release in San Juan County, Colorado, on August 5, 2015
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, Fannie Marie Jim, Leonard Lee, Rosina T Merritt, Jean Jones, George L Sisco, Rosemary Hart, Anita Hayes, Harry Peshlakai, Juanita Kee, Lena J Jones, Cecilia Wallace, Wade Shorthair, Susie Scott, Roger Shaggy, Emma Mitchell, Evelyn M Lee, Joe C Allen, Mary Clark, Huron Etsitty, Dorothy Phillips, Mary Jay, Reyvette Grey, Tom Horse, Ruby Nelson, Doris Coolidge, Joseph Emerson, Jacqueline L Begay, Daisy Barber, Lucy Dick, Gerald Maryboy, Harold Williams, Benjamin Clark, Shirley Bia, Ruby B Silas, Alice Begay, Danny Booher, Wilma Charley, Deloris Davis, Janice Terri Brown, Marie Yazzie, Raymond G Sells, Sheila Jim, Tom Blackhorse, Sherrell G Mesa, Albert H Lee, Harry Lane, Laura M Mitchell, Phyllis Valdez, Eric Smallcanyon, Walter White, Johnson Washburn, Jeannie Benally, Elsie Joe, Darrell Jim, Janice Frank, Joanna McDaniel, Lorenzo Yazzie, Rena Fasthorse, Harrison Johnson, Raymond G Willie, Darlene Bronston, Theron Jones, David Ben, Herman Enoah, Stella Cly, Tommy Draper, David Shorthair, Sammy Charley, Melvin Curley, Dorothy Todechine, Lucy B Mitchell, Beverly Maxwell, Darren Kee, Bessie Duncan, Taylor Black, Raymond Oldman, Lahoma Cly, Martha Curtis, Irvin Yazzie, Jimmy Nakai, Nina Benally, Helen Howard, Harry Benally, Robin Hayes, Carolyn Emerson, Paul Barber, Perry Hayes, Helen Tom, Mae Martin, Jeremiah Booher, Wanda Benally, Bessie Tesswood, Wallace McGilbert, Rose Benally, Della Weston, Lorraine Black, Shalina Grandson, Marilyn Silas, Vincent Todechene, Max Kellywood, Ella Silas, Lita Joe, Jessie Johnson, Carol Anagal, Marlena King, Alice D Yazzie, Julie Harrison, Hilda Baldwin, Wilford Atson, Lewis Todacheene, Wallace Hayes, James Grant, Don Curley, Jimmie Coolidge, Bessie S Pelt, Hubert Harwood, Roger Barber, Judy Begay, Thomas Pete, The Estate of Rose Merritt, Herbert Willie, Jenathan Begaye, Irene Livingston, Larena Benn, Teddy Smallcanyon, Roselyn Lee, Duane Aspaas, Freddie Hobson, Earl D Yazzie, Loren Garnanez, Roselyn Toledo, Calvin Yazzie, Lula Atcitty, Vernida Bissonette, Bernita Begay, Marlene Dobey, Anne Johnson, John Lansing, Phillip Rentz, Elsie Henry, Susie Dodge, Mary J Phillips, Mable Black, Emerson Hatathley, Laurence Bekise, Thomas T Tyler, James Simpson, Lena Willie, Timothy Ben, Mary Ann Manygoat, Daisy Houser, Arlene Begay, Esther Mark, Charley Jim, Ruth Nez, Roselyn Watchman, Ronnie Ross, Ron Miller, Charles D Phillips, Herman Hunt, Shandie Pioche, Virginia Jim, Raymond Jones, Herbert Todacheenie, Roger Sherman, Renita T Jones, Jay Yazzie, Helen Begay, Lenora Williams, Anthony Nabahe, Emerson Lee, Cheryl Armenta, Betty Begay, Betty Jones Nakai, Bessie Shorthair, Margaret Harrison, Andy Begay, Florence B King, Pauline D Nelson, Virginia Begay, Loretta Hatathley, Irita James, Roger L Simpson, Mae Begay, Kyle Jim, Geneva Jim, Alfred Curley, State of Utah, Francine Kiefert, Cecil Duncan, Raymond Pettigrew, Dina Benally, Jerry Todacheene, Annie BlueEyes, Etta Begaye, Joe Ann Duncan, Cynthia Madison, Celeste Silas, Albert Bylilly, Lula Sandoval, Sarah Slowman, Charlene Begay, Annie Henry, Rachel Dee, Sarah Frank, Harry S Nakai, Richard Begaye, Byron Nelson, Georgia Wilson, Sandra Begay, Cornelia Weston, Frank White, Gene Fred, Esther Reddoor, Eric Begay, Aaron Barber, Christina Silentman, Nelson Rockwell, Wilbert Cowboy, Mary Tso, Shawna Hamm, Sarah A Tony Benally, Marie Lee, Steve Benally, Jonah Jim, Anna Vigil, Louise Henderson, Lucy Rentz, Dora Todacheene, Mary Enoah, Tonita Nelson, Jonah Begay, Toni Claw, Andrew Brewster, Elton Dodge, Pearlene Benally, Terri Lameman-Austin, Sarah Police, Bertha A Etsitty, Leontyne Atcitty, Susan Benally, Frank John, Vernese Esplain, Gloria Lane, Scott Brady, Ronnie McDaniel, Michelle A Lee, Carmelita Lowe, Charles Phillips, Eddie Jay, Susie Yazzie, Robert Hayes, Norman Jim, Joanne Holliday, Marylita Begay, Bobby Sandoval, The Estate of Leon Jones, Jacqueline S Begay, Deborah Pratt, Allen E Etsitty, Wayne Begay, Ernest Benally, Roy Begay, Crystal Grey, Thurston Eddie, Priscilla Bigman, Kee Dan, Larry B Sam, Rowena Littlehat, Clarence D Weston, Corlivia Begaye, Bernadine Todechene, Ella Redhouse, Jackson Bunny, Wilson Phillips, Ada Lansing, James Mason, Daniel Jim, Vernon Phillips, The Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Rose Ann Tanner, Wesley Jones, Darrell Clah, Rechelleda Benallie, Michael Pratt, Garry Jay, Sylvia Mitchell, Davidson Devore, Marilyn Mustache, Michael N Little, Charlie N Todacheenie, Herman John, Annie Oldman, Esther A Yanito, Caroline Begay, Robert Bekise, Ivan Tyler, Elizabeth Begay, Perfina Rockwell, Harrison Cattleman, Flora Todechine, Irene Todacheenie, Lynalla Benn, Max Benally, Gary Smith, Ramona Pettigrew, Riley Garnanez, Jerome Smith, Eva Tso, John Tso, Laverne Nakai and Riley Garnenez
Defendant: Gold King Mine Release in San Juan County, Colorado, on August 5, 2015, Gold King Mines Corporation, John Does, Harrison Western Corporation, Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Sunnyside Gold Corporation, United States of America, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Gina McCarthy, Weston Solutions, Inc., Harrison Western Construction Corporation, San Juan Corp., Scott Pruitt and Salem Minerals, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Environmental Restoration, LLC
Special Master: Alan C. Torgerson
Case Number: 1:2018md02824
Filed: April 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 414 SECOND AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. (Torgerson, Alan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 413 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe C Allen Plaintiffs' (Ferlic, Katherine)
December 17, 2019 Filing 412 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe C Allen Plaintiffs' (Ferlic, Katherine)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER Canceling December 20, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. (Torgerson, Alan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 410 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Ninth Production of Documents (Lai, Albert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 409 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Eighth Production of Documents (Lai, Albert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of New Mexico New Mexicos Objections and Responses to Environmental Restoration, LLCs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One and Special Interrogatories, Set One (Rowenko, Lana)
December 11, 2019 Filing 407 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah RE: STATE OF UTAHS SECOND AMENDED OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO FEDERAL DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew)
December 11, 2019 Filing 406 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah RE: STATE OF UTAHS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATIONS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew)
December 11, 2019 Filing 405 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah RE: STATE OF UTAHS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATIONS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew)
December 11, 2019 Filing 404 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
December 10, 2019 Filing 403 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation CERTFICIATE OF SERVICE Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
December 9, 2019 Filing 402 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Seventh Production of Documents (Lai, Albert)
December 9, 2019 Filing 401 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re #389 Order Revised Production (Lai, Albert)
December 4, 2019 Filing 400 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for December 6, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference (Torgerson, Alan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 399 ANSWER to #380 Amended Complaint by Environmental Restoration, LLC.(Avchen, Terry)
December 2, 2019 Filing 398 ANSWER to #380 Amended Complaint for Personal Injuries and Damages by Weston Solutions, Inc..(Wechsler, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2019 Filing 397 NOTICE by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc. - Answer to Allen Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Personal Injuries and Damages Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Berge, Bradford)
November 29, 2019 Filing 396 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Sixth Production of Documents (Lai, Albert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 395 ANSWER to #380 Amended Complaint by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America.(Hammack, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 394 Defendant Sunnyside Gold Corporation's ANSWER to #380 Amended Complaint and CROSSCLAIM, CROSSCLAIM against Environmental Restoration, LLC, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Clarence D Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Weston Solutions, Inc. by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westesen, Neil)
November 26, 2019 Filing 393 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC (Avchen, Terry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 392 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC (Avchen, Terry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 391 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC (Avchen, Terry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 390 NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. Certificate of Service re third Weston Solutions, Inc. productionof documents made pursuant to Weston Solutions, Inc.'s Responses to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents to Weston Solutions, Inc., Set One Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER CONCERNING REDACTIONS MADE UNDER THE LAW ENFORCEMENT PRIVILEGE by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. (Torgerson, Alan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 388 RESPONSE in Opposition re (345 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Sunnyside Gold's Due Process Counterclaim filed by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UAO for OU3, #2 Exhibit UAO Modified SOW, #3 Exhibit EPA Letter re UAO)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Westesen, Neil)
November 22, 2019 Filing 387 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harrison Western Construction Corporation re Supplemental Response to State of Utah First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Molzahn, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 386 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Fifth Production of Documents (Lai, Albert)
November 20, 2019 Filing 385 USCA Information Letter with Case Number 19-2197 for (365 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 160 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (meq)
November 19, 2019 Filing 384 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Correction to First Production of Documents (Lai, Albert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 383 NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. Certificate of Service of Weston Solutions, Inc.'s Objections and First Supplemental Responses to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents to Weston Solutions, Inc., Set One Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER RESULTING FROM NOVEMBER 13, 2019 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Torgerson, Alan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 381 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joe C Allen Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 380 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries and Damages against All Defendants. adding Riley Garnenez, Laverne Nakai, Ramona Pettigrew, Gary Smith, Jerome Smith, Eva Tso and John Tso., filed by Joe C Allen. (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 379 NOTICE by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc Certificate of Service for first production of documents Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Angelley, Jules)
November 12, 2019 Filing 378 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Fourth Production of Documents (Lai, Albert)
November 11, 2019 Filing 377 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC (Avchen, Terry)
November 11, 2019 Filing 376 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Sunnyside Gold Corporation re (319 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 312 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 430 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Amend/Correct DEFENDANT SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS filed by Sunnyside Gold Corporation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
November 11, 2019 Filing 375 REPLY to Response to Motion re (319 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 312 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 430 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Amend/Correct DEFENDANT SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS - Assert Counterclaims filed by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
November 11, 2019 Filing 374 STIPULATED AMENDED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF QUESTIONNAIRES by SPECIAL MASTER HON. ALAN C. TORGERSON (Torgerson, Alan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 373 BRIEF re Objections to Federal Parties' Discovery Requests by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew W. Homer ISO Sovereign Plaintiff's Brief re Obj to Federal Ds' Discovery Requests)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Gilmour, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 372 BRIEF of Federal Parties Regarding Federal Parties' Objections to Producing Unredacted Witness Statements and Timing of Production of Documents by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Wong Declaration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Sovereign Plaintiff Correspondence))Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Bain, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 371 BRIEF REGARDING FEDERAL PARTIES OBLIGATIONS IN RESPONDING TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW L. HOFER IN SUPPORT OF SOVEREIGN PLAINTIFFS BRIEF REGARDING FEDERAL PARTIES OBLIGATIONS IN RESPONDING TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hofer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 370 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Regarding Plaintiffs' Questionnaires by Joe C Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 8, 2019 Filing 369 BRIEF of Federal Parties Regarding Sovereign Plaintiffs' Objections to Discovery by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Lynk, Brian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 368 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT UNDER COLO REV STAT 13-21-111.5(3)(b) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Westesen, Neil)
November 8, 2019 Filing 367 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT UNDER COLO REV STAT 13-21-111.5(3)(b) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Westesen, Neil)
November 8, 2019 Filing 366 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT UNDER COLO REV STAT 13-21-111.5(3)(b) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
November 8, 2019 Filing Fee Received: $ 505 receipt number 1084-6789796 re #365 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Avchen, Terry)
November 7, 2019 Filing 365 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL/ORDER OF USCA granting petition for permission for interlocutory appeal. (Appeal Fee Not Paid.) (meq)
November 7, 2019 Filing 364 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Production of Documents (Lai, Albert)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER OF USCA granting petition for permission to appeal. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Environmental Restoration shall pay the $505 filing and docketing fees to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Mexico. (meq)
November 7, 2019 Filing 362 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for First Supplement to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Morales, Nicholas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 361 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson Rescheduling Monthly Telephonic Status Conference for December 6, 2019 (Torgerson, Alan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 360 Discovery Order Following October 31, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Torgerson, Alan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 359 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - SGC's RESPONSES TO US' FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
November 1, 2019 Filing 358 ANSWER to #339 Amended Complaint, by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America.(Greenberg, Alan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 357 NOTICE by Kinross Gold Corporation of Certificate of Service for Responses and Objections to United States First Requests for Production Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Berge, Bradford)
November 1, 2019 Filing 356 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation of Defendant Sunnyside Gold Corporation's CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, Responses to United States of Americas First Requests for Production Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil) Modified text on 11/4/2019 (meq).
October 30, 2019 Filing 355 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah OF STATE OF UTAH'S AMENDED OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 354 Allen Plaintiffs' RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause re (155 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 39 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 335 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Order to Show Cause, filed by Joe C Allen. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Cox, Mark)
October 30, 2019 Filing 353 Unopposed Order Granting Extension on McDaniel Plaintiffs' Fact Sheets by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (Torgerson, Alan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 352 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for October 31, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference (Torgerson, Alan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 351 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation re (345 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Sunnyside Gold's Due Process Counterclaim -- NOTICE OF STIPULATION ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO US' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF THE PLEADING Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Westesen, Neil)
October 29, 2019 Filing 350 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation re (312 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Amend/Correct DEFENDANT SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS NOTICE OF STIPULATION ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND REPLY BRIEF Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
October 29, 2019 Filing 349 NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. Certificate of Service - second Weston Solutions, Inc. production of documents Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2019 Filing 348 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc (Berge, Bradford)
October 23, 2019 Filing 347 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation Certificate of Service - Responses to Sovereign Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents - Set One Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
October 23, 2019 Filing 346 RESPONSE in Opposition re (319 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 312 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Amend/Correct DEFENDANT SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS filed by State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF MATTHEW L. HOFER IN SUPPORT OF STATE OF UTAH'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COUNTERCLAIMS)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hofer, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 345 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Sunnyside Gold's Due Process Counterclaim by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Hoshijima, Tsuki)
October 21, 2019 Filing 344 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Navajo Nation Responses and Objections to the Federal Government's Requests for Production of Documents, Set One (Camp, Tanner)
October 21, 2019 Filing 343 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of New Mexico (Rowenko, Lana)
October 21, 2019 Filing 342 NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. Certificate of Service - Weston Solutions, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents to Weston Solutions, Inc., Set One Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER Rescheduling October's Monthly Telephonic Status Conference for October 31, 2019 by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson (Torgerson, Alan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 340 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC (Avchen, Terry)
October 17, 2019 Filing 339 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against Environmental Restoration, LLC, Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Gina McCarthy, Sunnyside Gold Corporation, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Weston Solutions, Inc.., filed by State of New Mexico, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Gilmour, John)
October 17, 2019 Filing 338 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson denying (268 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq)
October 17, 2019 Filing 337 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting (435 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 317 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (meq)
October 16, 2019 Filing 336 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting (254 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 99 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Complaint. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, The Allen Plaintiffs shall, within 14 days of entry of this Order, show cause why the Court should not dismiss one of the Allen cases. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, Adopting Special Master's Report and Recommendation #305 , #316 , on Plaintiff's Motion to Trifurcate Trial #271 Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq)
October 15, 2019 Filing 333 NOTICE by Joe C Allen of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 15, 2019 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Cox on behalf of Joe C Allen Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Cox, Mark)
October 15, 2019 Filing 331 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by United States of America re (268 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by United States of America Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Bain, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 330 REPLY to Response to Motion re (268 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Bain, John)
October 14, 2019 Filing 329 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah OF STATE OF UTAH'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 328 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harrison Western Construction Corporation of Serving First Supplemental Disclosures Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Molzahn, Brian) Modified title to COS on 10/15/2019 (meq).
October 14, 2019 Filing 327 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harrison Western Construction Corporation of Serving Responses to State of Utah's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Molzahn, Brian) Modified title to COS on 10/15/2019 (meq).
October 11, 2019 Filing 326 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re #279 Certificate of Service Federal Government's Response to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Requests for Production, Set One (Lai, Albert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 325 STIPULATION re (319 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 312 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 430 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Amend/Correct DEFENDANT SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS by State of Utah Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hofer, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of United States' First Set of Requests for Admissions to Sunnyside Gold Corporation (Moscato, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 323 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC re (141 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) Memorandum Opinion and Order re Filing of Petition for Permission to Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
October 3, 2019 Filing 322 RESPONSE to Motion re (317 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 435 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Greenberg, Alan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 321 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of United States' First Requests For Production To Sunnyside Gold Corporation (Moscato, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 320 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of United States' First Requests For Production To Kinross Gold Corporation (Moscato, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 319 RESPONSE in Opposition re (268 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joe C Allen, Joanna McDaniel, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew K. Walsh and exhibits 1-4)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Walsh, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 318 RESPONSE in Opposition re (268 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment McDaniel Plaintiffs' Joinder in Sovereign Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to United States' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Vega, Adrian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 317 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Gilmour, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 316 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Amendment to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiffs' Motion to Trifurcate Trial Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Amending Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Trifurcate Discovery by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER Resulting from September 27, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 313 First Amended Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Special Master Hon. Alana C. Torgerson Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 312 MOTION to Amend/Correct DEFENDANT SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
September 26, 2019 Filing 311 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Amended Agenda for September 27, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 310 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting #226 Petition for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
September 25, 2019 Filing 309 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for September 27, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 308 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah (Rowenko, Lana)
September 19, 2019 Filing 307 STIPULATION (also filed on behalf of Environmental Restoration) by Harrison Western Construction Corporation (Molzahn, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Filing 306 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Navajo Nation (Camp, Tanner)
September 11, 2019 Filing 305 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of Utah, Joanna McDaniel, State of New Mexico, Navajo Nation, Joe C Allen by Special Master. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Motion to Trifurcate Discovery by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson granting in part and denying in part (404) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; granting in part and denying in part (228) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; granting in part and denying in part (217) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY; granting in part and denying in part (271) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ; granting in part and denying in part (291) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:18-cv-00319-WJ; granting in part and denying in part (113) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK; granting in part and denying in part (8) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT and Provisional Discovery Plan and Setting Case Management Deadlines by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 302 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by State of New Mexico, State of Utah re (384 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC filed by State of New Mexico, (280 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC filed by State of Utah, (243 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC filed by State of Utah, State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hofer, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 301 REPLY to Response to Motion re (384 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC, (280 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC, (243 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC filed by State of New Mexico, State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hofer, Matthew)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Regarding Upcoming Discovery Deadlines, Requirements of Meet and Confer Conferences and Extension of Time to Respond to Federal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 299 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Completion of Briefing re Petition for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry)
August 30, 2019 Filing 298 NOTICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re (204 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Notice (Other), of Answer to Crossclaim of Sunnyside Gold Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to crossclaim)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Greenberg, Alan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 297 ANSWER to #197 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, of Sunnyside Gold Corporation by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America.(Greenberg, Alan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 296 ANSWER to #193 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, of Sunnyside Gold Corporation by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America.(Greenberg, Alan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 295 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Joe C Allen re (99 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 254 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Joe C Allen Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
August 30, 2019 Filing 294 REPLY to Response to Motion re (254 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Complaint Allen Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Joe C. Allen, Jr. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Ferlic, Katherine)
August 30, 2019 Filing 293 NOTICE by United States of America re (211 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Notice (Other) ANSWER to Sunnyside Gold Corporation's Crossclaim Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Hammack, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 292 Defendant Sunnyside Gold Corporation's ANSWER to #266 Answer to Crossclaim, & Affirmative Defenses to ER's Crossclaim by Sunnyside Gold Corporation.(Westesen, Neil)
August 30, 2019 Filing 291 Defendant Sunnyside Gold Corporation's ANSWER to #267 Answer to Crossclaim, & Affirmative Defenses to ER's Crossclaim by Sunnyside Gold Corporation.(Westesen, Neil)
August 29, 2019 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Johnson on behalf of Navajo Nation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Johnson, Lauren)
August 29, 2019 Filing 289 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for August 31, 2019 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 288 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America of the Federal Government's First Requests for Production to the State of Utah (Lai, Albert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 287 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America of the Federal Government's First Requests for Production to the State of New Mexico (Lai, Albert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 286 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America of the Federal Government's First Requests for Production to the Navajo Nation (Lai, Albert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 285 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by State of New Mexico re (8 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 404 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 113 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 217 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 291 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 228 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of Utah, Joanna McDaniel, State of New Mexico, Navajo Nation, Joe C Allen. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Homer, Andrew) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (meq).
August 27, 2019 Filing 284 RESPONSE in Support re (271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 113 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 217 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 291 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 228 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 8 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 404 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Homer, Andrew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 283 **FILED IN ERROR** RESPONSE in Support re (271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 113 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 217 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 291 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 228 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 8 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Homer, Andrew) Modified on 8/27/2019 Atty will refile and spread to all applicable cases (meq).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Questionnaires by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanner Camp on behalf of Navajo Nation (Camp, Tanner)
August 22, 2019 Filing 280 NOTICE by Joanna McDaniel Notice of Extension of Time Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Vega, Adrian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah OF SOVEREIGN PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO FEDERAL GOVERNMENT PARTIES, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 278 NOTICE by Joe C Allen of Extension of Time Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Ferlic, Katherine)
August 20, 2019 Filing 277 RESPONSE in Opposition re (8 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 404 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 113 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 217 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 291 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 228 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by Environmental Protection Agency, Scott Pruitt, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Greenberg, Alan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 276 Environmental Restoration, LLC's REPLY in Support of Petition for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal re (105 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 260 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Response, filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 275 RESPONSE in Opposition re (243 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 274 RESPONSE in Opposition re (99 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 254 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2019 Filing 273 RESPONSE in Opposition re (99 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 254 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Westesen, Neil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 272 RESPONSE in Opposition re (99 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 254 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Berge, Bradford)
August 15, 2019 Filing 271 MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial by Joe C Allen, Joanna McDaniel, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Rowenko, Lana)
August 15, 2019 Filing 270 NOTICE by Navajo Nation of Extension of Time Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Walsh, Andrew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 269 STIPULATION (also filed on behalf of Environmental Restoration, LLC) by Harrison Western Construction Corporation (Molzahn, Brian)
August 13, 2019 Filing 268 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Laura Williams Declaration and Declaration Exhibit Excerpts), #2 Exhibit 2 (Transcript Excerpt, May 31, 2019 Status Conference)) (Bain, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 267 ANSWER to #197 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, , CROSSCLAIM against Sunnyside Gold Corporation by Environmental Restoration, LLC.(Avchen, Terry)
August 12, 2019 Filing 266 ANSWER to #193 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, , CROSSCLAIM against Sunnyside Gold Corporation by Environmental Restoration, LLC.(Avchen, Terry)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTS TO JOINT STATUS REPORT by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson for (244 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Joint Status Report (JSR). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER Resulting from August 5, 2019 Initial Scheduling Conference by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 263 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re (97 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 212 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 244 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 383 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 279 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 206 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) Joint Status Report (JSR) Supplement by Environmental Restoration, LLC Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry)
August 8, 2019 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by Jules Elese Angelley on behalf of Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Angelley, Jules)
August 6, 2019 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Homer on behalf of State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Homer, Andrew)
August 6, 2019 Filing 260 Allen Plaintiffs' RESPONSE to Petition for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal re (81 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 226 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Joe C Allen. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk assign Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the presiding judge; and associate as a member case (19cv708) with the lead case in the multidistrict litigation case No. 1:18-md-2824-WJ Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting (256) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal, Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
August 5, 2019 Filing 257 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Order on Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 256 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal by Joe C Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 255 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joe C Allen Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Griffing, Katharine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 254 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Complaint by Joe C Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Griffing, Katharine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Farmer on behalf of Environmental Restoration, LLC Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Farmer, Terry)
August 1, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Farmer on behalf of Environmental Restoration, LLC Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Farmer, Terry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE by State of New Mexico Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance for Ann Al-Bahish Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Gilmour, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 250 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC re Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Farmer, Terry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 249 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC re Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Farmer, Terry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 248 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC re Pro Hac Vice Certification Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Farmer, Terry)
July 31, 2019 FILED IN ERROR - Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6577623 re: # 247 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by State of New Mexico (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rowenko, Lana) Modified docket text (refund requested on 08/01/19) on 8/1/2019 (ln).
July 31, 2019 Filing 247 **FILED IN ERROR** ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff State of New Mexico by Lana Rowenko (Association Dues - Online Payment) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Rowenko, Lana)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 8/1/2019 (meq).
July 31, 2019 Filing 246 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Report of Special Master Concerning Telephonic Status Conference held July 26, 2019 Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Lana Rowenko on behalf of State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Rowenko, Lana)
July 30, 2019 Filing 244 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Navajo Nation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Walsh, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 243 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC by State of New Mexico, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. (Hofer, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for July 26, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 241 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Williams, Sarah)
July 22, 2019 Filing 240 Kinross Gold Corporation's Answer to Federal Defendants' Crossclaim ANSWER to #192 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Kinross Gold Corporation.(Berge, Bradford)
July 22, 2019 Filing 239 Kinross Gold Corporation's Answer to Federal Defendants' Crossclaim ANSWER to #195 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Kinross Gold Corporation.(Berge, Bradford)
July 19, 2019 Filing 238 NOTICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, United States of America, United States of America withdrawal of counsel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Bhat, Simi)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson VACATING Doc. 232. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (mag)
July 17, 2019 Filing 236 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Briefing Schedule Regarding Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by State of Utah Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hsiao, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine Frances Griffing on behalf of Joe C Allen Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Griffing, Katharine)
July 16, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE by State of New Mexico Withdrawal of Appearance (Ann L. Al-Bahish) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (Gilmour, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Morales on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Morales, Nicholas)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, regarding the filing of Answers. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
July 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Harrison Western Construction Corporation on Third-Party Complaint. (khs)
July 2, 2019 Filing 231 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing its Jury Demand in the State of Utah Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 2, 2019 Filing 230 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing its Jury Demand in the State of New Mexico Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 2, 2019 Filing 229 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing its Jury Demand in the Navajo Nation Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 2, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing its Jury Demand in the McDaniel Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 2, 2019 Filing 227 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing its Jury Demand in the Allen Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 2, 2019 Filing 226 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Environmental Restoration, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 2, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by John Moscato on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Moscato, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 224 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah for Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Hofer, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 223 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Navajo Nation for Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Walsh, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 222 NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. of Answer to First Amended Complaint of Utah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 221 NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. of Filing of Answer to McDaniel Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC for Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Avchen, Terry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 219 NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. of Filing of Answer to Allen Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 218 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing Answer to State of Utah's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 217 Weston Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, New Mexico's First Amended Complaint by Weston Solutions, Inc..(Wechsler, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 216 Weston Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, First Amended Complaint of Navajo Nation by Weston Solutions, Inc..(Wechsler, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of New Mexico for Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Jackson, William)
July 1, 2019 Filing 214 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing Answer to State of New Mexico's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 213 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing Answer to Navajo Nation Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 212 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harrison Western Corporation for FRCP Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Molzahn, Brian)
July 1, 2019 Filing 211 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation Answer to Complaint and Crossclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Westesen, Neil)
July 1, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing Answer to McDaniel Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 209 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Filing Answer to Allen Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Avchen, Terry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 208 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Westesen, Neil)
July 1, 2019 Filing 207 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Pruitt, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America of Fed. R. CIv. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Greenberg, Alan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE by Harrison Western Corporation of Answer to State of Utah's First Amened Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Molzahn, Brian)
July 1, 2019 Filing 205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. re #184 Initial Scheduling Order,, for Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 204 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation re (93 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) Amended Complaint, ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & CROSSCLAIM to STATE OF UTAH'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
July 1, 2019 Filing 203 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc for Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Berge, Bradford)
July 1, 2019 Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe C Allen Allen Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Ferlic, Katherine)
July 1, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc. of Answer to Allen Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Berge, Bradford)
July 1, 2019 Filing 200 NOTICE by Environmental Protection Agency, Scott Pruitt, United States of America of Answer to First Amended Complaint of the State of Utah and Crossclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Answer to First Amended Complaint of the State of Utah and Crossclaim)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Greenberg, Alan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc of Answer to the State of Utah's Amended Complaint (Berge, Bradford)
July 1, 2019 Filing 198 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joanna McDaniel Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures (Vega, Adrian)
July 1, 2019 Filing 197 Defendant Sunnyside Gold Corporation's ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and, CROSSCLAIM to State of New Mexico's First Amended Complaint against State of New Mexico by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westesen, Neil)
July 1, 2019 Filing 196 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc.(Berge, Bradford)
July 1, 2019 Filing 195 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, of New Mexico, CROSSCLAIM against Kinross Gold Corporation, Sunnyside Gold Corporation by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lynk, Brian)
July 1, 2019 Filing 194 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc.(Berge, Bradford)
July 1, 2019 Filing 193 Defendant Sunnyside Gold Corporation's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES &, CROSSCLAIM to Navajo Nation's First Amended Defense against Navajo Nation by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westesen, Neil)
July 1, 2019 Filing 192 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, of Navajo Nation, CROSSCLAIM against Kinross Gold Corporation, Sunnyside Gold Corporation by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lynk, Brian)
July 1, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE by United States of America of Answer to Allen Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Federal Defendants Answer to the Allen Complaint))Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Bain, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE by United States of America of Answer to Second Amended McDaniel Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Federal Defendants Answer to Second Amended McDaniel Complaint))Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (Bain, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson re (183 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Order,,, Second Amendment to Order on Scope of Discovery Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for June 28, 2019 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Tsuki Hoshijima on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Hoshijima, Tsuki)
June 13, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson re (183 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Order,,, Amendment to Order on Scope of Discovery Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 185 OBJECTIONS re #183 Order,,, Clarification to Order on Scope of Discovery by Harrison Western Corporation (Molzahn, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 184 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 8/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 2nd Floor Courtroom before Special Master. Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 2nd Floor Courtroom before Special Master. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER On Scope of Discovery by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson re (178 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Brief, filed by State of Utah, State of New Mexico, Navajo Nation, (177 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Brief, filed by United States of America, United States Environmental Protection Agency, (179 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Joinder McDaniel Plaintiffs' Joinder in Sovereign Plaintiffs' Brief re Discovery and Case Management Issues filed by Joanna McDaniel, (180 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Notice (Other), filed by Joe C Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, granting in part and denying in part MOTION to Dismiss Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike #117 . Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
May 23, 2019 Filing 181 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for May 31, 2019 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 180 NOTICE by Joe C Allen Allen Plaintiffs Joinder In Sovereign Plaintiffs Brief Regarding Discovery and Case Management Issues Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
May 14, 2019 Filing 179 MOTION for Joinder McDaniel Plaintiffs' Joinder in Sovereighn Plaintiffs' Brief re Discovery and CAse Management Issues by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Vega, Adrian)
May 13, 2019 Filing 178 BRIEF of Sovereign Plaintiffs Regarding Discovery and Case Management Issues by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Walsh, Andrew)
May 13, 2019 Filing 177 BRIEF Stating All Defendants' Positions on Scope of Discovery and Case Phasing by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Williams Declaration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Fed. Def. Letter, March 27, 2019), #3 Exhibit 3 (Fed. Def. Letter, April 4, 2019), #4 Exhibit 4 (Sov. Pl. Letter, April 17, 2019), #5 Exhibit 5 (Letter, Westesen to Counsel, 4-16-19), #6 Exhibit 6 (Sov. Pl. Response to Westesen, 4-19-19))Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Bain, John)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Resulting from April 26,2019 Telephonic Status Conference by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for April 26, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Status Conference Held on March 29, 2019 by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2019 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, granting in part and denying in part #115 Defendants Sunnyside Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold U.S.A. Inc., and Kinross Gold Corporations Combined Motion to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs Complaint and Supporting Memorandum. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
March 29, 2019 Filing 171 Document Production Protocol Order with Appendix A by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #52 Defendant Gold King Mines Corporations Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (meq)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson denying as moot #55 Motion to Dismiss by Salem Minerals, Inc. and San Juan Corp. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (meq)
March 26, 2019 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #42 Defendants Sunnyside Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold U.S.A. Inc., and Kinross Gold Corporations Combined Motion to Dismiss and Supporting MemorandumAssociated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
March 26, 2019 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, denying #41 The Motion of Defendant Harrison Western Construction Corporation to DismissPlaintiff State of Utahs First Amended Complaint and denying #48 The Second Motion of Defendant Harrison Western Construction Corporation toDismiss Plaintiff State of Utahs First Amended Complaint Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
March 20, 2019 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, IT IS ORDERED that EPA Contractor Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, Doc. #45 , filed July 25, 2018, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
March 11, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Telephonic Status Conference and Agenda Items for March 29, 2019 Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, denying #44 The Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof, granting in part and denying in part #114 The Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum in Support. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson denying (118) Salem Minerals Inc. and San Juan Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, denying Motions to Consolidate #10 and #11 Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Regarding February 8, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for February 8 2019 by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE by United States of America of Restoration in Appropriations Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Lai, Albert)
January 25, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson that January 2019 Status Conference is cancelled Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE by United States of America of Entry of Administrative Order Staying Case (Attachments: #1 Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Hoses, Michael)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson finding as moot (318) Motion to Stay in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; finding as moot (162) Motion to Stay in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; finding as moot (149) Motion to Stay in case 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY; finding as moot (154) Motion to Stay in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ; finding as moot (214) Motion to Stay in case 1:18-cv-00319-WJ; finding as moot (35) Motion to Stay in case 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Vacating January 4, 2019 Status Conference by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Temporary Administrative Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 154 MOTION to Stay Status Conference Participation by United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Lai, Albert)
December 14, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Barks on behalf of State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Barks, Jennifer)
December 13, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson Notice of Agenda Item for January 4, 2019 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 151 Sovereign Plaintiffs' RESPONSE to Federal Defendants' Supplemental Authority re (201 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 149 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 139 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 304 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 23 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 137 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) Notice (Other),, filed by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Walsh, Andrew)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re Protective Order regarding Confidential Information by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE by Harrison Western Construction Corporation re #141 Brief, Joinder in Environmental Restoration, LLC's Brief in Opposition (Shared Virtual Document Repository) - (Molzahn, Brian)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re Protective Order Regarding Retention and Disposal of Physical Samples by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 146 FILED IN ERROR ORDER re Protective Order Regarding Privileged Material by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan) Modified to add error text on 12/7/2018 (jjs).
December 6, 2018 Filing 145 FILED IN ERROR-ORDER re Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information with Exhibit A by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan) Modified as per chambers on 12/7/2018 (jjs).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Relating to the Preservation of Potentially Relevant Information by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 143 BRIEF REGARDING JOINT DOCUMENT REPOSITORY by State of Utah Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hofer, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Proposed Shared Document Repository filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Hammack, David)
December 6, 2018 Filing 141 BRIEF In Opposition to a Shared Virtual Document Repository by Environmental Restoration, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Pazuniak, Andriy)
December 6, 2018 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Proposed Shared Document Repository filed by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Berge, Bradford)
December 4, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re (114 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Gadsden v United States))Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Bain, John)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Amending Document 125 and Changing Deadline re Agenda Items (125 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Order by Special Master. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
November 30, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to San Juan Corp., San Juan Corp., Salem Minerals, Inc. and Salem Minerals, Inc. by Joe C Allen Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 29, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc. re (8 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) MOTION to Dismiss Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike filed by Weston Solutions, Inc., Environmental Restoration, LLC, (117 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike filed by Weston Solutions, Inc., Environmental Restoration, LLC Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re (8 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) MOTION to Dismiss Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike, (117 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re (6 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by United States of America, United States Environmental Protection Agency, (114 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by United States of America, United States Environmental Protection Agency Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Bain, John)
November 29, 2018 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion re (6 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Bain, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson Special Master Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., Sunnyside Gold Corporation re (115 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint & Supporting Memorandum filed by Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Kinross Gold Corporation, Sunnyside Gold Corporation, (7 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) MOTION to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint & Supporting Memorandum filed by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., Sunnyside Gold Corporation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Berge, Bradford)
November 20, 2018 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re (115 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint & Supporting Memorandum, (7 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) MOTION to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint & Supporting Memorandum filed by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Berge, Bradford)
November 15, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE by Joe C Allen of Agreed Extension of Time Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re (117 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike Allen Plaintiffs' Brief In Opposition to EPA Contractor Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike filed by Joe C Allen. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re (115 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint & Supporting Memorandum Allen Plaintiffs' Brief In Opposition to Mining Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Joe C Allen. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re (114 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Allen Plaintiffs' Brief In Opposition to Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Joe C Allen. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Regarding November 5, 2018 Status Conference by Special Master Alan C Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (Torgerson, Alan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE by Joanna McDaniel re (123 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 295 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 127 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 140 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 192 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) Status Report McDaniel Plaintiffs' Joinder in Allen Plaintiffs' Status Report Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Vega, Adrian)
November 2, 2018 Filing 123 STATUS REPORT by Joe C Allen Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Ferlic, Katherine)
November 2, 2018 Filing 122 STATUS REPORT of Defendant Harrison Western Construction Corporation by Harrison Western Construction Corporation (Molzahn, Brian)
November 2, 2018 Filing 121 STATUS REPORT for November 5th Status Conference by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Sunnyside Gold Corporation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
November 1, 2018 Filing 120 STATUS REPORT by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hofer, Matthew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 119 STATUS REPORT by Salem Minerals, Inc. (Lovejoy, Lindsay)
November 1, 2018 Filing 118 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Salem Minerals, Inc.. (Lovejoy, Lindsay)
November 1, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike by Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc.. (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Special Master granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony D. Edwards terminated in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; granting (126) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony D. Edwards terminated in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; granting (118) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony D. Edwards terminated in case 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY; granting (94) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony D. Edwards terminated in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ; granting (180) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony D. Edwards terminated in case 1:18-cv-00319-WJ Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Torgerson, Alan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss the Allen Plaintiffs' Complaint & Supporting Memorandum by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Westesen, Neil)
November 1, 2018 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Bain, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 113 STATUS REPORT of Contractor Defendants for November 5 Status Conference by Environmental Restoration, LLC Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Pazuniak, Andriy)
October 30, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE by State of New Mexico, State of New Mexico Withdrawal of Appearance-Rodriguez Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Gilmour, John)
October 30, 2018 Filing 111 STATUS REPORT by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Lai, Albert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 110 Mining Defendants' RESPONSE to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority re (108 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 131 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 286 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 185 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) Notice (Other) filed by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
October 22, 2018 Filing 109 RESPONSE to Motion re (126 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 118 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 94 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 280 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Navajo Nation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (Walsh, Andrew)
October 22, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE by Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of New Mexico, State of Utah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Gilmour, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re (76 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 271 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 116 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 170 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) Reply to Response to Motion, (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Supplemental Authority Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Greenfield, Meghan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE by Joanna McDaniel Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Martin J. Chavez) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (Vega, Adrian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 105 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Joanna McDaniel Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Martin J. Chavez) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (Vega, Adrian) Modified on 10/18/2018 add error text due to wrong document attached per attorney request (gr).
October 18, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jonathan Hammack on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hammack, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE by State of New Mexico Withdrawal of Appearance-Valastro Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Gilmour, John)
October 15, 2018 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe C Allen as to Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc. (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 11, 2018 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe C Allen as to Salem Minerals, Inc., San Juan Corp.. (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 11, 2018 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe C Allen as to Weston Solutions, Inc.. (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 10, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter Hsiao Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hsiao, Peter)
October 10, 2018 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe C Allen as to Weston Solutions, Inc.. (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 10, 2018 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe C Allen as to Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 10, 2018 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe C Allen as to Environmental Restoration, LLC. (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 9, 2018 Filing 95 RESPONSE to Motion re (180 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Berge, Bradford)
October 8, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gold King Mines Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Edwards, Anthony)
October 8, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Gold King Mines Corporation re (52 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gold King Mines Corporation, (44 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gold King Mines Corporation, (41 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gold King Mines Corporation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Edwards, Anthony)
October 5, 2018 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Salem Minerals, Inc.. (Lovejoy, Lindsay)
October 4, 2018 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Salem Minerals, Inc.. (Lovejoy, Lindsay)
October 4, 2018 Filing 90 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe C Allen. (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 4, 2018 Filing 89 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe C Allen. United States of America served on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 1, 2018 Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER by Special Master. Status Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 2nd Floor Courtroom before Special Master. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Torgerson, Alan)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Special Master granting (267) Motion Unopposed Motion for a Status Conference in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; granting (112) Motion Unopposed Motion for a Status Conference in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; granting (106) Motion Unopposed Motion for a Status Conference in case 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY; granting (72) Motion Unopposed Motion for a Status Conference in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ; granting (166) Motion Unopposed Motion for a Status Conference in case 1:18-cv-00319-WJ Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Torgerson, Alan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Powers, William)
September 25, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America, United States Environmental Protection Agency Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Powers, William)
September 24, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc. re (45 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Weston Solutions, Inc., (46 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support filed by Weston Solutions, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., Sunnyside Gold Corporation re (42 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 42 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Memorandum filed by Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Kinross Gold Corporation, Sunnyside Gold Corporation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Berge, Bradford)
September 24, 2018 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff State of Utah's First Amended Complaint) filed by Harrison Western Construction Corporation. (Molzahn, Brian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re (52 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (44 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (41 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gold King Mines Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Edwards, Anthony)
September 21, 2018 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re (45 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, (46 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support filed by Weston Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Support re #48 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Plaintiff State of Utah First Amended Complaint) (in Opposition to Plaintiff State of Utah's Request to Strike HW's Second Motion to Dismiss) filed by Harrison Western Construction Corporation. (Molzahn, Brian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE by Harrison Western Construction Corporation of Completion (of briefing re Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff State of Utah's First Amended Complaint) (Molzahn, Brian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff State of Utah's First Amended Complaint) filed by Harrison Western Construction Corporation. (Molzahn, Brian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Greenfield, Meghan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re (55 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss , (52 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (41 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction McDaniel Plaintiffs' Supplement to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to the Mining Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Vega, Adrian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re (42 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 42 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Memorandum filed by Sunnyside Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil)
September 19, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Lai on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Lai, Albert)
September 17, 2018 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION For Status Conference by Joe C Allen. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Ferlic, Katherine)
September 17, 2018 Filing 71 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joanna McDaniel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY (Vega, Adrian)
September 17, 2018 Filing 70 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Gilmour, John)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER OF REFERENCE by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, Honorable Alan C. Torgerson appointed as Special Master. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
September 13, 2018 Filing 68 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Navajo Nation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Walsh, Andrew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re (52 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (42 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 42 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Memorandum filed by Navajo Nation, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John D.S. Gilmour, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Gilmour, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re (45 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, (52 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (46 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support McDaniel Plaintiffs' Supplement to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to the Contractor Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
September 7, 2018 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (58 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs McDaniel Adoption of Sovereign Plaintiffs' Arguments in Opposition to Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
September 6, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE by Harrison Western Construction Corporation re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff State of Utah's First Amended Complaint) (EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY) (Molzahn, Brian)
August 31, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah re (158 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 100 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 259 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 61 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 104 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) Response in Opposition to Motion, Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Kaba, Moez)
August 31, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hofer, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Kaba, Moez)
August 31, 2018 Filing 60 DECLARATION re (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by State of Utah Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hsiao, Peter)
August 27, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re (145 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 145 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum filed by State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hsiao, Peter)
August 24, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re (45 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Kaba, Moez)
August 21, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto D Ortega on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Ortega, Roberto)
August 17, 2018 Filing 56 Defendants' RESPONSE to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Recommendation Regarding Appointment of Special Master re (97 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 252 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 149 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 50 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 93 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) Report filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC, Harrison Western Construction Corporation, Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Salem Minerals, Inc., San Juan Corp., Sunnyside Gold Corporation, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Weston Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss by Salem Minerals, Inc., San Juan Corp.. (Lovejoy, Lindsay)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting (253) Motion in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; granting (98) Motion in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; granting (94) Motion in case 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY; granting (53) Motion in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ; granting (150) Motion in case 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
August 13, 2018 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION re (44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 44 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Set Dates-Certain for the Parties' Briefs by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (E-mail from Martin Chavez to Adam Bain, Aug. 2, 2018), #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Bain, John)
August 8, 2018 Filing 52 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Gold King Mines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Edwards, Anthony)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ASSOCIATING CASE WITH MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (meq)
August 3, 2018 Filing 50 REPORT by Navajo Nation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Walsh, Andrew)
August 3, 2018 Filing 49 REPORT by Weston Solutions, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2018 Filing 48 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Plaintiff State of Utah First Amended Complaint) by Harrison Western Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Molzahn, Brian)
August 3, 2018 Alias Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney on Amended Complaint.(kdh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 47 REPORT by Navajo Nation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Walsh, Andrew)
July 25, 2018 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss by Weston Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Wechsler, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/24/2018 Mtn Termed (meq).
July 25, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Weston Solutions, Inc.. (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Lynk, Brian)
July 25, 2018 Filing 43 REPORT by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Powers, William)
July 25, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Memorandum by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Sunnyside Gold Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Decree, #2 Declaration of Roach, #3 Declaration of Litt, #4 Declaration of Grady) (Westesen, Neil)
July 25, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff State of Utah's First Amended Complaint) by Harrison Western Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Part 1, #5 Exhibit D - Part 2, #6 Exhibit E - Part 1, #7 Exhibit E - Part 2, #8 Exhibit E - Part 3, #9 Exhibit E - Part 4, #10 Exhibit F) (Molzahn, Brian)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RELATING TO MOTION TO CLARIFY by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
July 18, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by Navajo Nation of Withdrawal of Appearance Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Mitchell, Kasey)
July 13, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Collins, Paul)
July 12, 2018 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of New Mexico as to Weston Solutions, Inc.. (Gilmour, John)
July 6, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Clarify Order Regarding Appointment of Special Master by Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 First Proposed Order, #3 Second Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Lynk, Brian)
June 26, 2018 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Initial Conference held on 6-19-2018, before Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary Loughran, Telephone number 505-348-2334. Transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at www.nmcourt.fed.us. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 7/3/2018. Redaction Request due 7/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2018.(mkl)
June 25, 2018 Filing 34 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, denying (26 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by San Juan Corp., Salem Minerals, Inc., (41 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gold King Mines Corporation, (58 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
June 21, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases McDaniel Plaintiffs Reply to Response of Weston Solutions, Inc.'s Response to Motions to Consolidate filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
June 21, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases McDaniel Plaintiffs Reply to Responses by Salem and San Juan filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
June 21, 2018 Filing 31 BRIEF Re Proposed Case Management Order Number One by State of Utah Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hsiao, Peter)
June 20, 2018 Filing 29 BRIEF Re Proposed Case Management Order Number One by State of Utah Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Hsiao, Peter)
June 20, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs McDaniel, et al. Reply to Sunnyside Gold Corporation's Response to Motions to Consolidate and Kinross Gold Corporation and Kinross Gold USA Inc.'s Joinder in Response to Motions to Consolidate filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
June 19, 2018 Filing 30 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief District Judge William P. Johnson: Initial Conference held on 6/19/2018. (Court Reporter M. Loughran) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, Regarding Appointment of Special Master Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
June 18, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases McDaniel Plaintiffs Joinder in Defendant United States' Reply to Sovereign Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Consolidate filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
June 15, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Bain, John)
June 14, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Harrison Western Construction Corporation by Joanna McDaniel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
June 13, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED REPLY to Response to Motion re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Amended McDaniels Plaintiffs Reply to Defendant United States' Response to Motion to Consolidate and Response to Defendant United States' Motion to Consolidate filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin) Modified on 6/14/2018 added amended (meq).
June 13, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases McDaniels Plaintiffs Reply to Defendant United States' Response to Motion to Consolidate and Response to Defendant United States' Motion to Consolidate filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
June 7, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Gilmour, John)
June 7, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Harrison Western Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Molzahn, Brian)
June 7, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Weston Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Wechsler, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Gina McCarthy, Scott Pruitt, United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Powers, William)
June 7, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Salem Minerals, Inc., San Juan Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Lovejoy, Lindsay)
June 6, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re (120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Berge, Bradford)
June 6, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re (10 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 217 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 120 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 66 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (65 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 67 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 121 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 11 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 218 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Oven, Jeffery)
June 4, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Navajo Nation. (Walsh, Andrew)
June 4, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Navajo Nation. United States of America served on 5/19/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. (Walsh, Andrew)
June 1, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION OF PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by United States of America Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Bain, John)
May 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Joanna McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transfer Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Chavez, Martin)
May 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, United States of America. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Powers, William)
May 17, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Navajo Nation as to Weston Solutions, Inc.. (Walsh, Andrew)
May 15, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States, United States Attorney and Weston Solutions, Inc. (jg) Modified docket text on 5/31/2018 (ln).
May 11, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gina McCarthy, Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc., United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Kinross Gold Corporation, Sunnyside Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., filed by State of New Mexico. (Jackson, William)
May 11, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gold King Mines Corporation, Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc., United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Kinross Gold Corporation, Sunnyside Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., filed by Navajo Nation. (Kaba, Moez)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting (212) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; granting (64) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; granting (5) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (meq)
May 4, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaints by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Kaba, Moez)
April 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Gold King Mines Corporation Pursuant to Rule 25(a) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Edwards, Anthony)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. Initial Conference set for 6/19/2018 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 540 Bonito Courtroom before Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
April 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 18-md-2824 WJ has been opened and assigned to District Judge William P. Johnson. See Docket for further entries.As the case proceeds, counsel may be alerted to updated case listings, or Case Management Orders in a similar fashion. However, once Liaison Counsel are appointed and shoulder the responsibility of service for documents posted in the lead case, such docket entries will no longer be necessary. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) Modified docket text on 4/5/2018 to include document number and text only language (kdh).
April 4, 2018 Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson assigned. (ng)
April 4, 2018 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407 the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of New Mexico are transferred to the District of New Mexico and assigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (ng)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Gold King Mine Release in San Juan County, Colorado, on August 5, 2015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold King Mine Release in San Juan County, Colorado, on August 5, 2015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold King Mines Corporation
Represented By: Anthony D. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Western Corporation
Represented By: Darin J. Lang
Represented By: Ryan P. Atkinson
Represented By: Brian Molzahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinross Gold Corporation
Represented By: Bradford C. Berge
Represented By: Craig D. Galli
Represented By: Steven G. Jones
Represented By: Jill H. Van Noord
Represented By: Jules Elese Angelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinross Gold USA, Inc
Represented By: Bradford C. Berge
Represented By: Craig D. Galli
Represented By: Steven G. Jones
Represented By: Jill H. Van Noord
Represented By: Jules Elese Angelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyside Gold Corporation
Represented By: Paul C. Collins
Represented By: Neil G Westesen
Represented By: Christopher C. Stoneback
Represented By: Bradford C. Berge
Represented By: Jeffery J Oven
Represented By: Mark L. Stermitz
Represented By: Pamela C. Garman
Represented By: Jared Michael Le Fevre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: William G. Powers
Represented By: Brian H. Lynk
Represented By: Sarah Williams
Represented By: Simi Bhat
Represented By: John A. Bain
Represented By: Michael Williams
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Greenfield
Represented By: Alan D Greenberg
Represented By: David Jonathan Hammack
Represented By: Albert Lai
Represented By: Roberto D Ortega
Represented By: Tsuki Hoshijima
Represented By: John Moscato
Represented By: Nicholas Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: William G. Powers
Represented By: Brian H. Lynk
Represented By: Sarah Williams
Represented By: Simi Bhat
Represented By: John A. Bain
Represented By: Michael Williams
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Greenfield
Represented By: Alan D Greenberg
Represented By: Albert Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Represented By: Brian H. Lynk
Represented By: Simi Bhat
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kari E. Olson
Represented By: Louis W. Rose
Represented By: Kaitlyn A. Luck
Represented By: Jeffrey J Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Western Construction Corporation
Represented By: Paul T Yarbrough
Represented By: Brian Molzahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan Corp.
Represented By: Lindsay A Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Pruitt
Represented By: Alan D Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Minerals, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay A Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Represented By: John C Hueston
Represented By: Andrew K Walsh
Represented By: Kasey L Mitchell
Represented By: Paul Spruhan
Represented By: Lauren Johnson
Represented By: Tanner Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Ann L. Al-Bahish
Represented By: William James Jackson
Represented By: Cholla Khoury
Represented By: Jordan A Rodriguez
Represented By: John D.S. Gilmour
Represented By: Lauren K. Valastro
Represented By: Jordon P. George
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer Barks
Represented By: Lana Rowenko
Represented By: Andrew Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Marie Jim
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Lee
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosina T Merritt
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Jones
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L Sisco
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Hart
Represented By: Adrian O. Vega
Represented By: Martin J. Chavez
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Hayes
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Peshlakai
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Kee
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena J Jones
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Wallace
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Shorthair
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Scott
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Shaggy
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Mitchell
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn M Lee
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe C Allen
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Clark
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huron Etsitty
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Phillips
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jay
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyvette Grey
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Horse
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Nelson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Coolidge
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Emerson
Represented By: Adrian O. Vega
Represented By: Martin J. Chavez
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline L Begay
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Barber
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Dick
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Maryboy
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Williams
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Clark
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Bia
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby B Silas
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Begay
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Booher
Represented By: Adrian O. Vega
Represented By: Martin J. Chavez
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Charley
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Davis
Represented By: Adrian O. Vega
Represented By: Martin J. Chavez
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Terri Brown
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Yazzie
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond G Sells
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Jim
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Blackhorse
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrell G Mesa
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert H Lee
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Lane
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura M Mitchell
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Valdez
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Smallcanyon
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter White
Represented By: Adrian O. Vega
Represented By: Martin J. Chavez
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Washburn
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Benally
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Joe
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Jim
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Frank
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna McDaniel
Represented By: Adrian O. Vega
Represented By: Martin J. Chavez
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Yazzie
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rena Fasthorse
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Johnson
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond G Willie
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Bronston
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theron Jones
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ben
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Enoah
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Cly
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Draper
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Shorthair
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Charley
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Curley
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Todechine
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy B Mitchell
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Maxwell
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Kee
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Duncan
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Black
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Oldman
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lahoma Cly
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Curtis
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin Yazzie
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Nakai
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Benally
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Howard
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Benally
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Hayes
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Emerson
Represented By: Adrian O. Vega
Represented By: Martin J. Chavez
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Barber
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Hayes
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Tom
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Martin
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Booher
Represented By: Adrian O. Vega
Represented By: Martin J. Chavez
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Benally
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Tesswood
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace McGilbert
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Benally
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della Weston
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Black
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalina Grandson
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Silas
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Todechene
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Kellywood
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Silas
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lita Joe
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Johnson
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Anagal
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlena King
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice D Yazzie
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Harrison
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Baldwin
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilford Atson
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Todacheene
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Hayes
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grant
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Curley
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Coolidge
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie S Pelt
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Harwood
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Barber
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Begay
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pete
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Rose Merritt
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Willie
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenathan Begaye
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Livingston
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larena Benn
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Smallcanyon
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselyn Lee
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Aspaas
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Hobson
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl D Yazzie
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Garnanez
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselyn Toledo
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Yazzie
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Atcitty
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernida Bissonette
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernita Begay
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Mark A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Dobey
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Represented By: Brian F Egolf, Jr
Represented By: