Driscoll v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Judy Driscoll
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00026
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
1 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand , #10 MOTION to Remand Memorandum In Support filed by Judy Driscoll. (Grueninger, Peter)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Shore, Sarah)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., 13 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Judy Driscoll. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Judy Driscoll voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Grueninger, Peter)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Stipulated Motion to Stay (Doc. 11) is GRANTED. The Court's Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 5), and all hearings and deadlines set forth therein, are hereby VACATED, except that a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should still be submitted by each party no later than 2/22/2019. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order in this case pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kmt)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Judy Driscoll. (Grueninger, Peter)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Memorandum In Support by Judy Driscoll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Grueninger, Peter)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Judy Driscoll. (Grueninger, Peter)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. (Garcia, Monica)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Garcia, Monica)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Costco Wholesale Corporation, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Garcia, Monica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 2/7/2019. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 2/19/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 2/28/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/22/2019. (kmt)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB042345 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Garcia, Monica)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 14, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2018-04820. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Garcia, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driscoll v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Monica R Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Represented By: Monica R Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Driscoll
Represented By: Peter Damien Grueninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?