Martinez v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Arturo Martinez
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00059
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Judith C Herrera
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Keith, Ann) Modified on 2/11/2019 to specify notice(mnb).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/2/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/26/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/15/2019. (pv)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company (Keith, Ann)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Keith, Ann)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Arturo Martinez Certificate of Interested Parties (Fadner, Derek)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L Fadner on behalf of Arturo Martinez (Fadner, Derek)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 22, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
January 22, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6236957 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Keith, Ann)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Thirteenth Judical District, case number D-1329-CV-2018-02514. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Keith, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann Louise Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Martinez
Represented By: Derek L Fadner
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?