Hairston v. Spectra Tech, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph K Hairston
Defendant: Spectra Tech, Inc. and Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00062
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
1 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Continuing Stay. This proceeding is stayed for another 30 days after the date of this Order to allow the parties to continue their settlement discussions. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Status Report On Settlement Negotiations by Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC (Jarrett, Danny)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties are ordered to provide a status report to the Court in thirty (30) days regarding the status of their settlement negotiations. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #5 Motion to Stay Proceeding. All instructions, deadlines, and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 4) are VACATED. (kc)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceeding by Spectra Tech, Inc.. (Lamont, Charlotte)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 3/19/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/6/2019. (hm)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spectra Tech, Inc. (Lamont, Charlotte)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 22, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
January 22, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6238198 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Spectra Tech, Inc. dba Spectra Tech New Mexico, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lamont, Charlotte)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Spectra Tech, Inc. dba Spectra Tech New Mexico, Inc. from State of New Mexico County of Eddy Fifth Judicial District, case number D-503-CV-2018-01715. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Spectra Tech, Inc. dba Spectra Tech New Mexico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamont, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hairston v. Spectra Tech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Tech, Inc.
Represented By: J Mark Ogden
Represented By: Charlotte A. Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC
Represented By: Danny W. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph K Hairston
Represented By: David B. Joeckel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?