Chavez v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Arsenio N Chavez and Nick A. Chavez
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00399
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Stipulation of Dismissal by District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. This case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. (anl)
February 14, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BNSF Railway Company (Rodriguez, Justin)
January 16, 2020 Filing 31 VERBAL NOTICE of Settlement by Counsel for BNSF Railway Company. Dismissal paperwork due by 02/16/2020. (jlg)
January 7, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company of First Supplemental Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (McFall, Julia) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (bap).
December 30, 2019 Filing 29 JOINT NOTICE of Extension of Briefing Deadline by Arsenio N Chavez re #27 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kvas, William) Modified on 12/31/2019 (bap).
December 20, 2019 Filing 27 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (McFall, Julia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by BNSF Railway Company re #21 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BNSF Railway Company (McFall, Julia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BNSF Railway Company. (McFall, Julia)
December 3, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT NOTICE by BNSF Railway Company of Extension of Briefing Deadlines re #21 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (McFall, Julia) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (bap).
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Arsenio N Chavez. (Kvas, William)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arsenio N Chavez Responses to BNSF Second Set of Requests for Production (Kvas, William) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (bap).
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by BNSF Railway Company. (McFall, Julia)
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company Second Set of Requests for Production (McFall, Julia) Modified text on 10/24/2019 (bap).
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arsenio N Chavez Of Plaintiff's Objections to BNSF First Set of Interrogatories (Kvas, William)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON INTIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. Status Conference set for 1/22/20 at 1:30 p.m. via telephone before Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. Dispositive Motions deadline 2/20/20. Response deadline 3/5/20. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 3/12/20 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal (New Mexico courtroom location to be determined at a later date). Plaintiff's expert witness designation deadline 12/20/19. Defendant's expert witness designation deadline 1/21/20. Dsicovery cut off 2/13/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/20 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal (New Mexico courtroom location to be determined at a later date). Jury Trial (5 days) set for 5/4/20 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal (New Mexico courtroom location to be determined at a later date). (anl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 (TEXT-ONLY) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/21/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Davis) (anl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production to Plaintiff Nick Chavez (McFall, Julia) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (meq).
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 8/21/2019 at 01:30 PM via telephone before District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. See Notice for call in information. (anl)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonas Nahoum on behalf of Arsenio N Chavez (Nahoum, Jonas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arsenio N Chavez Interrogatories, set one and Request for Production of Documents, set one (Kvas, William) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (bap).
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company Initial Disclosures (McFall, Julia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Arsenio N Chavez of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Kvas, William)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Kvas, William)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 8/20/2019 at 09:00 AM via telephone before District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. See Notice for call in information. (anl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 11:00 AM via telephone before District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. (anl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company (Rodriguez, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BNSF Railway Company (Rodriguez, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Arsenio N Chavez.(Rodriguez, Justin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kvas on behalf of Arsenio N Chavez (Kvas, William)
May 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (jg)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D Rodriguez on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Rodriguez, Justin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BNSF Railway Company as to BNSF Railway Company. (Rodriguez, Justin)
May 1, 2019 United States District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and United States Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned. (jg)
May 1, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6410841 re #1 Complaint, filed by Arsenio N Chavez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Komer, Mark)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries Based on Violations of the Federal Employees Liability Act and the Federal Safety Appliance Act against BNSF Railway Company ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Arsenio N Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Komer, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arsenio N Chavez
Represented By: Mark E. Komer
Represented By: William Kvas
Represented By: Jonas Nahoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick A. Chavez
Represented By: Mark E. Komer
Represented By: William Kvas
Represented By: Jonas Nahoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Represented By: Julia E. McFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?