Tapia v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: James J. Tapia
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00463
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Valerio on behalf of Social Security Administration (Valerio, Christina)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James J. Tapia. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (vh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by James J. Tapia, 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Social Security Administration. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (sju)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James J. Tapia. U.S. Attorney General served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (ln)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James J. Tapia. Social Security Administration served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (ln)
June 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (khs)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summons and Complaint on the United States Attorney, the Attorney General, and the Office of the General Counsel, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3). (mm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James J. Tapia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Application)) (Martone, Feliz) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (vh).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), James J. Tapia voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martone, Feliz)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
May 20, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (ln)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by James J. Tapia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martone, Feliz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tapia v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Tapia
Represented By: Feliz MariSol Martone
Represented By: Gary J Martone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Represented By: Christina Valerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?