Duran v. Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County et al
Plaintiff: Kendall R. Duran
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, John McCauley, Manuel Gonzales, III, Mark Cerna and Matthew Rael
Case Number: 1:2019cv00471
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Connect conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. (tkl)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2019. (tkl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/10/2019. Recording Info: Liberty Court Recording System (ABQ MJ6th Floor South) (tkl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael County Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 Joint Status Report Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael (Robles, Luis)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kendall R. Duran (Robles, Luis)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael re #11 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by Kendall R. Duran (Robles, Luis)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 County Defendants' REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to Amended Notice of Removal re #7 Notice (Other), filed by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael. (Robles, Luis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Opposed MOTION to Remand County Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael. (Robles, Luis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic hearing on the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw (DOc. 6) held on 6/6/2019. (tkl)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting Withdrawal of Counsel by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Attorney Frances Crockett Carpenter terminated. (tkl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Robles, Luis)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael. (Robles, Luis)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Kendall R. Duran. (Carpenter, Frances)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. (tkl)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. A telephonic hearing on the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw (Doc. 6) shall be held on 6/6/2019 at 10:30 AM. Plaintiff's counsel shall advise Plaintiff of the hearing and require Plaintiff to appear for the hearing telephonically. Counsel for both sides and Plaintiff should call the Court's AT&T conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. (tkl)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
May 24, 2019 Motions terminated: #4 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Kendall R. Duran. (jg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Robles, Luis) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (mjr).
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kendall R. Duran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Carpenter, Frances)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kendall R. Duran. (Carpenter, Frances)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR - CORRECT DOCUMENT FILED AS DOC #6 *** Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kendall R. Duran. (Carpenter, Frances) Modified on 5/24/2019 (jg).
May 22, 2019 District Judge Judith C. Herrera and Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (mnb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Sauer Rahn on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, New Mexico, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael (Rahn, Taylor)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Robles on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, New Mexico, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III, John McCauley, Matthew Rael (Robles, Luis)
May 22, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6442437 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, New Mexico, John McCauley, Matthew Rael, Mark Cerna, Manuel Gonzales, III (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Robles, Luis)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Rael, John McCauley, Manuel Gonzales, III, Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, New Mexico, Mark Cerna Notice of Removal from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-02748. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Matthew Rael, John McCauley, Manuel Gonzales, III, Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, New Mexico, Mark Cerna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robles, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall R. Duran
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of Bernalillo County
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Taylor Sauer Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCauley
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Taylor Sauer Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Gonzales, III
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Taylor Sauer Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cerna
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Taylor Sauer Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Rael
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Taylor Sauer Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?