Michaud v. R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Dennis Michaud
Defendant: R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00479
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 7/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (bap)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea VACATING telephonic Rule 16 hearing. In light of Judge Browning's assignment as presiding judge in this case, the scheduling conference set for July 10, 2019 and 11:00 AM is hereby vacated. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. re Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Lowry, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Status Report by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. (Lowry, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for July 10, 2019 at 11:00 AM. Joint Status Report due by June 25, 2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than June 28, 2019. (cbf)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. (Lowry, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.. (Lowry, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 24, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
May 23, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6446197 re: # 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lowry, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. (Lowry, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of: Ellis B. Murov Deutsch Kerrigan, LLP 755 Magazine StreetNew Orleans, Louisiana 70130 504-581-5141 Fax 504-566-1201 emurov@deutschkerrigan.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lowry, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 23, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6446152 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lowry, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-03350. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowry, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michaud v. R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Michaud
Represented By: David B. Joeckel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Represented By: Ellis B. Murov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?