Acosta Yanez v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Ismael Acosta Yanez
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00546
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: A Telephonic Status Conference on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #4 is hereby set for Wednesday, August 21, 2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. (kys)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 23, 2019 Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Initial Scheduling Deadlines #14 , the deadline of Tuesday, July 23, 2019 for submitting the Joint Status Report is hereby VACATED. The Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, August 21, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kys)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Stay Initial Scheduling Deadlines #13 by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kys)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Ismael Acosta Yanez. (Ayala, Anthony)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3) (Piazza, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: The telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 8/2/2019 is hereby reset for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. All remaining provisions of the Court's Initial Scheduling Order remain in full force and effect. (KK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Response due by 7/16/2019. Reply due by 7/30/2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kys)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Ismael Acosta Yanez. (Ayala, Anthony)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 7/12/2019. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 7/23/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/29/2019. (kmt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (khs)
June 13, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6483006 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Piazza, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from NM State Court Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2019-03641. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Affidavit Exhibit C)(Piazza, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta Yanez v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Acosta Yanez
Represented By: Anthony James Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?