Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc. v. G.W.C. Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, G.W.C. Construction, Inc., J.E. Dunn Construction Company and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00549
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
3 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, J.E. Dunn Construction Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (jg)
July 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to G.W.C. Construction, Inc. (ln)
July 12, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6538189 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burwell, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Good Standing by Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc. (Royce, K Stephen)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc. by Christopher G. Burwell (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burwell, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (jg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR - SUMMONSES INCORRECTLY SUBMITTED*** SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons)(Royce, K Stephen) Modified on 6/18/2019 (jg). Modified on 6/18/2019 (jg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosures filed by Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc.. (Royce, K Stephen) Modified on 6/18/2019 (jg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough, Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 17, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (khs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (khs)
June 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6484438 re #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America, for the use and Benefit of Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Royce, K Stephen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, G.W.C. Construction, Inc., Hartford Fire Insuance Company, J.E. Dunn Construction Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by United States of America, for the use and Benefit of Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Royce, K Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc. v. G.W.C. Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.W.C. Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E. Dunn Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Border Demolition & Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: K Stephen Royce
Represented By: Christopher G. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?