Nosseir et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Mostafa Nosseir and Gabriel Nosseir
Defendant: Mike Pompeo, USA, FBI, US Department of State, Christopher A. Wray, William P Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigations and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00557
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: James A Parker
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L Walters on behalf of United States of America (Walters, Tiffany)
July 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser. (ln)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 "FILED IN ERROR" missing certified return receipt. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. (Weeks, Amber) Modified on 7/22/2019 (bap).
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 "FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. Mike Pompeo served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; US Department of State served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Weeks, Amber) Modified on 7/22/2019 (bap).
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Lea Weeks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weeks, Amber)
July 7, 2019 Filing 2 "FILED IN ERROR" will refile separately . SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. All Defendants. (Vrapi, Olsi) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (bap).
June 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Mike Pompeo, US Department of State, United States of America, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney (jg)
June 17, 2019 United States District Judge James A. Parker and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
June 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6485828 re #1 Complaint, filed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vrapi, Olsi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Gabriel Nosseir, Mostafa Nosseir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Vrapi, Olsi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nosseir et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of State
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mostafa Nosseir
Represented By: Olsi Vrapi
Represented By: Amber Lea Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Nosseir
Represented By: Olsi Vrapi
Represented By: Amber Lea Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?