J.V. v. The GEO Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: J.V.
Defendant: Mark Bowen, William Allen, Northeast New Mexico Detention Facility and The Geo Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00559
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION by William Allen (Beck, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 09/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. The parties are to call Judge Yarbrough's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-808-6929, Access Code 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 09/16/2019. (cm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' Answer to Inmate Petition , filed by Mark Bowen, The Geo Group, Inc.. Related document: #2 Amended Complaint filed by J.V.. (Jahner, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Beck on behalf of William Allen (Beck, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.V.. William Allen served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Carpenter, Frances)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.V.. The Geo Group, Inc. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Carpenter, Frances)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.V.. Mark Bowen served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Carpenter, Frances)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough for recommendation of ultimate disposition. (mag)
June 27, 2019 Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to William Allen, Mark Bowen, The Geo Group, Inc.. (jg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against The Geo Group, Inc., Mark Bowen, William Allen. terminating Northeast New Mexico Detention Facility., filed by J.V.. (Carpenter, Frances)
June 17, 2019 Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
June 17, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6486346 re #1 Complaint filed by J V (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Carpenter, Frances)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by J V. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Frances)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.V. v. The GEO Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bowen
Represented By: Michael S. Jahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Allen
Represented By: Robert O. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast New Mexico Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Geo Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Jahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.V.
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?