Kimo Constructors, Inc. v. The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Kimo Constructors, Inc.
Defendant: Jamie Shiver, Shiver Southwest LLC, Jake Shiver, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and E-Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv00565
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E-Corp (Crown, Ross)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Crown, Ross)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by E-Corp. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Jake Shiver.(Crown, Ross)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 2:00 PM in Mammoth, Wyoming - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. (gr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jake Shiver, Jamie Shiver, Shiver Southwest LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Jake Shiver.(Chavez, Tibo)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tibo Juan Chavez, Jr on behalf of Jake Shiver, Jamie Shiver, Shiver Southwest LLC (Chavez, Tibo)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Jake Shiver, Jamie Shiver, Shiver Southwest LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Jake Shiver.(Chavez, Tibo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 7/17/19 by Defendant The Ohio Casualty Company Acknowledgement filed by Kimo Constructors, Inc. (Bingham, Wayne) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (bap).
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 7/11/19 by Defendant E-Corp Acknowledgement filed by Kimo Constructors, Inc. (Bingham, Wayne) Modified text to add date on 7/16/2019 (bap).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimo Constructors, Inc.. Jake Shiver served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Bingham, Wayne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimo Constructors, Inc.. Jamie Shiver served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Bingham, Wayne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimo Constructors, Inc.. Shiver Southwest LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Bingham, Wayne)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to E-Corp, Jake Shiver, Jamie Shiver, Shiver Southwest LLC, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (jg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States District Judge Scott W. Skavdahl to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) Modified docket text on 6/20/2019 (ln).
June 19, 2019 United States District Judge Scott W. Skavdahl and United States Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman assigned. (jg)
June 18, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6490876 re #1 Complaint, filed by Jake Shiver (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bingham, Wayne)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jake Shiver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit No. 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit No. 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit No. 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit No. 4)(Bingham, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimo Constructors, Inc. v. The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Shiver
Represented By: Tibo Juan Chavez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiver Southwest LLC
Represented By: Tibo Juan Chavez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Shiver
Represented By: Wayne E Bingham
Represented By: Tibo Juan Chavez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimo Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne E Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?