JMD Construction Services, LLC v. JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JMD Construction Services, LLC
Defendant: Edgar Flores Construction, Inc. and JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC
Counter Defendant: TCF National Bank, Fedex Freight, Inc., John Does I-X, Four Pine, LLC, KW AQE LLC, KMK FX LLC and All Unknown Claimants in Interest
Case Number: 1:2019cv00578
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court, a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/20/2019. (kys)
August 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to Four Pine, LLC, John Does I-X, TCF National Bank. (jg)
August 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Unknown Claimants in Interest, Fedex Freight, Inc., JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC, JMD Construction Services, LLC, KMK FX LLC. (jg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JMD Construction Services, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC by Edgar Flores Construction, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by JMD Construction Services, LLC.(Garrett, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Garrett on behalf of Edgar Flores Construction, Inc. (Garrett, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JMD Construction Services, LLC. JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Calvert, Sean) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dr).
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JMD Construction Services, LLC. Edgar Flores Construction, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Calvert, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 "FILED IN ERROR" will refile. SUMMONS Returned Executed by JMD Construction Services, LLC. JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Calvert, Sean) Modified on 7/16/2019 (bap).
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by JMD Construction Services, LLC re 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Good Standing David Gershner (Calvert, Sean)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by JMD Construction Services, LLC re 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Charles Davidson (Calvert, Sean)
June 27, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6510084 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by JMD Construction Services, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Calvert, Sean)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff JMD Construction Services, LLC by Sean R Calvert on behalf of: David L. Gershner Davidson Law Firm P.O. Box 1300Little Rock, Arkansas 72203 5013749977 david.gershner@dlf-ar.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Calvert, Sean)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 27, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6509556 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by JMD Construction Services, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Calvert, Sean)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff JMD Construction Services, LLC by Sean R Calvert on behalf of: Charles Davidson Davidson Law Firm P.O. Box 1300Little Rock, Arkansas 72203 5013749977 david.gershner@dlf-ar.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Calvert, Sean)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Edgar Flores Construction, Inc., JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC. (jg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 21, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
June 21, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6499359 re #1 Complaint filed by JMD Construction Services, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Calvert, Sean)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by JMD Construction Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Calvert, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JMD Construction Services, LLC v. JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Flores Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Residential & Commercial Construction, LLC
Represented By: Michael T Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMD Construction Services, LLC
Represented By: Sean R Calvert
Represented By: David L Gershner
Represented By: Charles Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: TCF National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Fedex Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Four Pine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: KW AQE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: KMK FX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: All Unknown Claimants in Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?