Jaramillo et al v. Dill
Appellee: Craig Dill
Appellant: Rick Jaramillo and Steve Duran
In Re: Railyard Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00589
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to cure defects by 09/05/2019. (cm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Certificate of Service Bankruptcy Clerk's Inability to Transmit Record on Appeal by Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (mjr)
June 27, 2019 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal and Election to have Appeal heard by District Court by Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaramillo et al v. Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Craig Dill
Represented By: Samuel I Roybal
Represented By: Thomas D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rick Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Steve Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Railyard Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?