Mendoza-Alarcon v. USA
Petitioner: Luis Mendoza-Alarcon
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00613
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #5 Respondent's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond. The United States' Answer is due no later than September 5, 2019. (jcm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Order to Answer by USA. (Mysliwiec, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by USA of Entry of Appearance of Counsel (Mysliwiec, Paul)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The United States' Answer is due no later than August 5, 2019. (jcm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , filed by Luis Mendoza-Alarcon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A-DC Judgment in a Criminal Case, #2 Attachment B-10th Cir. Decision, dtd 4-25-19, #3 Attachment C-Jury instruction on elements of conspiracy, #4 Attachment D-Jury note, #5 Attachment E-Transcript of argument & dist. ct. ruling on jury note, #6 Attachment F-Court's response to jury note, #7 Attachment G-Transcript of defendant's 1-11-18 sentencing, #8 Attachment H-Transcript of excerpt of Judge's stmts at co-def's sentencing)(Rivas, Irma)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (khs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza-Alarcon v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Mendoza-Alarcon
Represented By: Irma Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Paul Mysliwiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?