JBI Electrical Systems, Inc. v. KW AQE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JBI Electrical Systems, Inc.
Defendant: JMD Construction Services, LLC and KW AQE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00614
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by JMD Construction Services, LLC, KW AQE, LLC (Calvert, Sean)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by JMD Construction Services, LLC, KW AQE, LLC. (Calvert, Sean)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JBI Electrical Systems, Inc.., filed by JBI Electrical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stevens-Block, Leah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by JBI Electrical Systems, Inc.. (Stevens-Block, Leah)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough VACATING #10 Initial Scheduling Order. All deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order are terminated and the Rule 16 conference scheduled for 9/17/2019 at 02:30 PM is VACATED. (kfg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Leah M Stevens-Block (Stevens-Block, Leah)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R Calvert on behalf of JMD Construction Services, LLC, KW AQE, LLC (Calvert, Sean)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer In support by JMD Construction Services, LLC, KW AQE, LLC (Calvert, Sean)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by JMD Construction Services, LLC, KW AQE, LLC. (Calvert, Sean)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JBI Electrical Systems, Inc.. JMD Construction Services, LLC served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Stevens-Block, Leah)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JBI Electrical Systems, Inc.. KW AQE, LLC served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Stevens-Block, Leah)
July 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to JMD Construction Services, LLC, KW AQE, LLC. (khs)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6522841 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (khs)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Implied Warranty of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Foreclosure on the Claim of Lien, and Unjust Enrichment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by JBI Electrical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Stevens-Block, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JBI Electrical Systems, Inc. v. KW AQE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMD Construction Services, LLC
Represented By: Sean R Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KW AQE, LLC
Represented By: Sean R Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBI Electrical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Leah M Stevens-Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?