Lucero v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marcella Lucero
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc. and CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00620
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kys)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Deadline for Plaintiff to amend and join additional parties: October 18, 2019; Deadline for Defendants to amend and join additional parties: November 15, 2019; Plaintiff's expert disclosure deadline: January 15, 2020; Defendants' expert disclosure deadline: February 17, 2020; Termination date for discovery: March 18, 2020; Motions relating to discovery to be filed by: April 7, 2020; Pretrial motions due by: April 17, 2020; Pretrial Order: Plaintiff to Defendants by June 2, 2020, and from Defendants to the Court by June 16, 2020. (kys)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/21/2019. (kys)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC, CoreCivic, Inc. re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC, CoreCivic, Inc. (Lee, Jacob)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC, CoreCivic, Inc.. (Lee, Jacob)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marcella Lucero Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Dominguez, Paul)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC, CoreCivic, Inc. Re: Initial Disclosure Statement (Lee, Jacob)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC, CoreCivic, Inc. (Lee, Jacob)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marcella Lucero. (Dominguez, Paul)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Protective Order and ENTERING Protective Agreement and Order by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kys)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Marcella Lucero Notice of Extension of Time to File Response (Dominguez, Paul)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Protective Order by Marcella Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Agreement and Order) (Dominguez, Paul)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC, CoreCivic, Inc. (Lee, Jacob)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC, CoreCivic, Inc.. (Lee, Jacob)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 4 and 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/1/2019. (kys)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 9, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
July 8, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6528797 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC, CoreCivic, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lee, Jacob)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CoreCivic, Inc., CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, County of Cibola, case number D-1333-CV-201800138. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CoreCivic, Inc., CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint (State Court), #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Records, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Lee, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Represented By: Deborah D. Wells
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Represented By: Deborah D. Wells
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Lucero
Represented By: Paul M Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?