Kirmer v. Neptune Management Corp.

Plaintiff: Eric Kirmer
Defendant: Service Corporation International d/b/a The Neptune Society, Neptune Management Corp. and Service Corporation International
Case Number: 1:2019cv00649
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: James A Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearings before District Judge James A. Parker: Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 6th Floor Courtroom; Call of the Calendar set for 7/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 6th Floor Courtroom; Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 6th Floor Courtroom. (snn)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 12/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 12/9/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendant by 11/25/2019. Defendant's counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 12/3/2019. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 12/5/2019. (kmt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to amend by 9/25/2019. Defendant to seek leave to amend by 10/25/2019. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 12/31/2019. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 1/31/2020. Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Discovery motions due by 3/16/2020. Pretrial motions due by 3/26/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by 5/18/2020 and from Defendant to the Court by 6/1/2020. (kmt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2019. (kmt)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Neptune Management Corp. (Defendant's Initial Disclosures) (Lamont, Charlotte)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eric Kirmer initial disclosures (Faber, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Eric Kirmer jury demand (Faber, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Neptune Management Corp. (Lamont, Charlotte)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa granting #9 Unopposed Motion to Amend Caption. (tkl)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption by Service Corporation International. (Lamont, Charlotte)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Retaliatory Discharge by Service Corporation International. (Lamont, Charlotte)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 3 and 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Connect conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/8/2019. (tkl)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 17, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
July 16, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6546998 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Service Corporation International d/b/a The Neptune Society (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lamont, Charlotte)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Service Corporation International d/b/a The Neptune Society from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1329-CV-2019-01334. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Service Corporation International d/b/a The Neptune Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamont, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirmer v. Neptune Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Kirmer
Represented By: Daniel M. Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Corporation International d/b/a The Neptune Society
Represented By: Charlotte A. Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neptune Management Corp.
Represented By: Charlotte A. Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Corporation International
Represented By: Charlotte A. Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?