ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. v. Familyworks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Irene Harris, Lindsey R. Fooks, Alison Endicott-Quinones, Joey Jacobs, Familyworks, Inc, Joseph F. Torrez, Youth and Family Centered Services of New Mexico, Inc., Clarence Garcia, Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. and Debbie Garcia
Case Number: 1:2019cv00691
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.. Debbie Garcia served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Brant, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.. Clarence Garcia served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Brant, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Irene Harris ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Irene Harris. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc..(Ferlic, Katherine)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM. Joint Status Report due by 10/07/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 09/10/2019. (cm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alison Endicott-Quinones, Lindsey R. Fooks, Joseph F. Torrez. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc..(Hart, F)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by F Michael Hart on behalf of Alison Endicott-Quinones, Lindsey R. Fooks, Joseph F. Torrez (Hart, F)
July 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., Alison Endicott-Quinones, Familyworks, Inc, Lindsey R. Fooks, Clarence Garcia, Debbie Garcia, Irene Harris, Joey Jacobs, Joseph F. Torrez, Youth and Family Centered Services of New Mexico, Inc.. (jg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Exhibit 1 by ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. (Wollitz, Howard)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 29, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
July 29, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6570429 re #1 Complaint filed by ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wollitz, Howard)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wollitz, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. v. Familyworks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Wollitz
Represented By: Jeannie Hunt
Represented By: John M. Brant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey R. Fooks
Represented By: Kelly A. Stout Sanchez
Represented By: F Michael Hart
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Endicott-Quinones
Represented By: Kelly A. Stout Sanchez
Represented By: F Michael Hart
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Familyworks, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F. Torrez
Represented By: Kelly A. Stout Sanchez
Represented By: F Michael Hart
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youth and Family Centered Services of New Mexico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?