Mitchell v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michelle Leigh Mitchell
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00717
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Karen B Molzen
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Laura J. Johnson substituted for Michael D Armstrong (Johnson, Laura)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar as the trial judge and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Vina Johnson on behalf of Social Security Administration (Johnson, Victoria)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (khs)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ln)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is authorized to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee, costs, or security therefore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summons and Complaint on the United States Attorney, the Attorney General, and the Office of the General Counsel, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). (KBM)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle Leigh Mitchell. (Armstrong, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by Michelle Leigh Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Armstrong, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Represented By: Victoria Vina Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Leigh Mitchell
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Represented By: Laura J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?