San Juan Regional Medical Center v. 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company et al.
Plaintiff: San Juan Regional Medical Center
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company and Judy Lynn Parker
3Rd Party Plaintiff: The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C.
3Rd Party Defendant: Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C. and The Midland Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv00734
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Stay filed by The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C., The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C.. (Lyle, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Sanctions filed by The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C., The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (Lyle, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C. re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C., The Midland Group, San Juan Regional Medical Center (Jackson, Travis)
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C., San Juan Regional Medical Center, The Midland Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Jackson, Travis)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 is VACATED, pending briefing and a ruling on the Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines #21 . (smd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 Joint Status Report by Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C., San Juan Regional Medical Center, The Midland Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Jackson, Travis)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay by Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C., San Juan Regional Medical Center, The Midland Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Jackson, Travis)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Sanctions by Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C., San Juan Regional Medical Center. (Jackson, Travis)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 Joint Status Report And Provisional Discovery Plan by The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C., The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C. (Lyle, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by San Juan Regional Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Jackson, Travis)
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 14. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C., The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit) (Lyle, James)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Clemens on behalf of The Midland Group (Clemens, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kys)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C., San Juan Regional Medical Center, The Midland Group.(Jackson, Travis)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C., San Juan Regional Medical Center, The Midland Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Jackson, Travis)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company re #8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Crossclaim, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Anderson, William)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Complaint For Payment Of Hospital Lien, CROSSCLAIM Against Def. Parker against 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company. (Anderson, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C. re #6 Order,,, Set Hearings,, (Lyle, James)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Conference line at 888 363 4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourt.gov. Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2019. (smd)
August 20, 2019 Summons on Third Party Complaint Issued as to Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C., The Midland Group. (dr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 13, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
August 12, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6598540 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lyle, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C. - Record Before The Second Judicial District Court (Lyle, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Midland Group, Jackson Loman Stanford & Downey P.C., COUNTERCLAIM against San Juan Regional Medical Center by Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C.. (Lyle, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-0579. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lyle, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-0579. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyle, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Juan Regional Medical Center v. 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company
Represented By: William R Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Lynn Parker
Represented By: James P. Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juan Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Barbara J. Koenig
Represented By: Travis G Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: The Law Offices of James P. Lyle, P.C.
Represented By: James P. Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jackson, Loman, Standford and Downey, P.C.
Represented By: Barbara J. Koenig
Represented By: Travis G Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Midland Group
Represented By: Barbara J. Koenig
Represented By: Michael Clemens
Represented By: Travis G Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?