Brown et al v. Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Coy Brown
Defendant: USAGOLD, Inc., Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Does 1-20, Michael Kosares and FNU Does
Case Number: 1:2019cv00736
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc. re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Including Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc. (Hess, Stephen)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY in Support re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Including Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hess, Stephen) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (mjr).
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc. (Hess, Stephen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Coy Brown (Garcia, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Including Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Coy Brown. (Garcia, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Coy Brown Certification Pursuant to D.N.M.LR 83.3(a)(1) (Garcia, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Garcia on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Garcia, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate USAGOLD Inc. for Centennial Precious Metals, Inc.. (Hess, Stephen)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Association Dues Received online: $ 100 paid, receipt number # 1084-6606485 re: 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Plaintiff Coy Brown (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Association Dues Received online: $ 100 paid, receipt number # 1084-6606317 re: 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Plaintiff Coy Brown (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Coy Brown by David A. Garcia on behalf of: Richard I. Arshonsky Levinson Arshonsky & Kurtz, LLP 15303 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1650Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 (818) 382-3434 rarshonsky@laklawyers.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Garcia, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Coy Brown by David A. Garcia on behalf of: Robert A. Levinson Levinson Arshonsky & Kurtz, LLP 15303 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1650Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 (818) 382-3434 rlevinson@laklawyers.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Garcia, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
August 13, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (ln)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Including Supporting Memorandum of Law by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc.. (Hess, Stephen)
August 12, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6599717 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hess, Stephen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc. from State of New Mexico, County of Bernalillo, case number D-202-CV-2019-05425. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., Michael Kosares, USAGOLD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Notice of Removal), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Docket), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hess, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Centennial Precious Metals, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAGOLD, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen A. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Precious Metals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen A. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kosares
Represented By: Stephen A. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Does
Represented By: Stephen A. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coy Brown
Represented By: Richard I. Arshonsky
Represented By: David A. Garcia
Represented By: Robert A. Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?