Crumbacher v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Crumbacher
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00822
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT AND TELEPHONIC PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2020. The parties are to call the AT&T Teleconference line: 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. The parties' letters are due 12/27/2019, 1/3/2020, and 1/7/2020, as set forth in the attached Order. (smd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of parties due by 12/2/2019. Defendant's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2019. Plaintiff's Experts due 02/28/2020. Defendant's Experts due 03/27/2020. Discovery due by 6/11/2020. Discovery Motions due 07/01/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/13/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order Plaintiff to Defendant due 08/28/2020, Defendant to Court due 9/11/2020. (smd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2019. (smd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order and Agreed Confidentiality Stipulation by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ewert, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (Walters, Ryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Ewert, Robert)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Crumbacher of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Ferlic, Katherine)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by October 14, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. No adverse consequences will result from any party's failure or refusal to consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Walters, Ryan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Conference line at 888 363 4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform Chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov. Joint Status Report due by 10/03/2019. (smd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Walters, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Walters, Ryan) Modified on 9/6/2019 (jg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crumbacher v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M Walters
Represented By: Robert Ewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Crumbacher
Represented By: Kristina Caffrey
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Represented By: Katherine M Ferlic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?