King v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Russell Alan King
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00843
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Vacating Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 8). All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order are VACATED. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerri Lee Allensworth on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Allensworth, Kerri)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Allen, Meena)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter VACATING Telephonic Pre-Trial Status Conference set for 10/8/19. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting Telephonic Pre-Trial Status Conference for 10/8/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Counsel shall call the toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press # to be joined to the proceedings. (plp)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov. The JSR is due 10/16/2019. (smd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Russell Alan King Certificate of Interested Parties (Fadner, Derek)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L Fadner on behalf of Russell Alan King (Fadner, Derek)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 12, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Allen, Meena)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Allen, Meena)
September 11, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6665357 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-05814. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Alan King
Represented By: Derek L Fadner
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Represented By: Kerri Lee Allensworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?