Distinguished Development, LLC v. Evanston Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Distinguished Development, LLC
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00848
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 12/4/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 11/27/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/14/2019. (mlt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Evanston Insurance Company. (Schwarz, Todd)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Distinguished Development, LLC Certificate of Interested Parties (Fadner, Derek)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L Fadner on behalf of Distinguished Development, LLC (Fadner, Derek)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
September 13, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (aek)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evanston Insurance Company (Schwarz, Todd)
September 13, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6669539 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Evanston Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schwarz, Todd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Evanston Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-05811. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwarz, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Distinguished Development, LLC v. Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Schwarz
Represented By: Samantha E Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Distinguished Development, LLC
Represented By: Derek L Fadner
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?