Madden v. Ortiz et al
Plaintiff: Shani Madden
Defendant: Raul Torrez and Ken Ortiz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00865
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ken Ortiz, Raul Torrez Initial Disclosures (Marcus, Lawrence)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough VACATING the Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 and all corresponding deadlines. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Shani Madden re #8 Response, #9 Reply, #3 Notice (Other) of Completion of Briefing (Stalter, Kenneth)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's REPLY in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #8 Response, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Shani Madden. (Stalter, Kenneth)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Mtoion for Preliminary Injunction re #3 Notice (Other) filed by Ken Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Marcus, Lawrence)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:30 AM. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929, Access Code: 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 11/01/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/17/2019. (cm)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ken Ortiz, Raul Torrez. (Marcus, Lawrence)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ken Ortiz, Raul Torrez of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Marcus, Lawrence)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Shani Madden of Pending Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Response to Motion) (Stalter, Kenneth)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
September 18, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ln)
September 18, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6680780 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ken Ortiz, Raul Torrez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marcus, Lawrence)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Raul Torrez, Ken Ortiz from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-06567. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Raul Torrez, Ken Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Marcus, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madden v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Torrez
Represented By: Lawrence M Marcus
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Ortiz
Represented By: Lawrence M Marcus
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shani Madden
Represented By: Kenneth Harding Stalter
Represented By: Sean FitzPatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?