Board of Trustees of the Chilili Land Grant v. AHWI Maschinebau GMBH et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Chilili Land Grant
Defendant: AHWI Maschinenbau GMBH and Prinoth GMBH, Prinoth GMBH and AHWI Maschinenbau GMBH
Case Number: 1:2019cv00883
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order of Dismissal without prejudice by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Prinoth GMBH (Ish, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 6, 7 and 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Board of Trustees of the Chilili Land Grant (Garcia, Narciso)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kls)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding good cause to extend the time to issue the scheduling order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). The Court will delay the issuance of its Initial Scheduling Order pending resolution of #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AHWI Maschinenbau GMBH and Prinoth GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Ish, Mark) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (mjr).
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AHWI Maschinenbau GMBH and Prinoth GMBH. (Ish, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by AHWI Maschinenbau GMBH and Prinoth GMBH. (Ish, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 23, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
September 23, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6689772 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ish, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AHWI Maschinebau GMBH and Prinoth GMBH from Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2019-04653. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by AHWI Maschinebau GMBH and Prinoth GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ish, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Chilili Land Grant v. AHWI Maschinebau GMBH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Chilili Land Grant
Represented By: Narciso Garcia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHWI Maschinenbau GMBH and Prinoth GMBH
Represented By: Mark L. Ish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinoth GMBH
Represented By: Mark L. Ish
Represented By: Gregory Smithkier
Represented By: Carol Jean Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHWI Maschinenbau GMBH
Represented By: Mark L. Ish
Represented By: Gregory Smithkier
Represented By: Carol Jean Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?