Nelson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: James Nelson
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00907
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company on the Subpoena Duces Tecum to the Better Business Bureau (Piazza, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 06/07/2021, through 06/10/2021, (approximately four (4) days), at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 05/07/2021, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 04/09/2021, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to amend by 12/15/2019. Defendant to seek leave to amend by 12/31/2019. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 2/28/2020. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 4/1/2020. Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Discovery motions due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial motions due by 7/16/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by 9/21/2020 and from Defendant to the Court by 10/5/2020. (kmt)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/8/2019. (kmt)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Companys First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff James Nelson (Piazza, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Initial Disclosures (Piazza, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Piazza, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Negligence, Breach of Insurance Contract, Violation of the New Mexico Unfair Claims Practices Act, and Bad Faith Actions by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by James Nelson Certificate of Interested Parties (Fadner, Derek)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L Fadner on behalf of James Nelson (Fadner, Derek)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 10/18/2019. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 10/29/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/1/2019. (kmt)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 27, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
September 27, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6701739 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Piazza, Elizabeth)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from New Mexico Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-06032. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Piazza, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nelson
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Represented By: Derek L Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?