Berke v. USA
Petitioner: Nathan Berke
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00914
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen by District Judge James O. Browning (vv)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A Brawley on behalf of USA (Brawley, Kimberly)
September 30, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (ln)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Nathan Berke. (vv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berke v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Kimberly A Brawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?