Bradford v. Roark et al
Plaintiff: Mark Bradford
Defendant: Jerry Roark, J. Gallegos, Jessica Herrera, Pat Lovato and FNU Lindsey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00915
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Bradford (vv)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Show Cause Response due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 Complaint. Mail sent to Mark Bradford (vv)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (plp)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to Cure Deficiency by 11/1/2019. (plp)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
September 30, 2019 United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (ln)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Bradford. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. Roark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Lovato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?