Presbyterian Healthcare Services v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Presbyterian Healthcare Services
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company and FM Global
Case Number: 1:2019cv00952
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by Factory Mutual Insurance Company.(Johnson, Scott)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 1/14/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephoneshould inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 oremailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov. Joint Status Report due by 1/2/2020. (smd)
December 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #15 Motion to Dismiss by Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Ramsey, Erica)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Factory Mutual Insurance Company of Agreed Extension of time to Respond to Amended Complaint (Johnson, Scott)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Presbyterian Healthcare Services. (Schultz, Andrew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Violation of the New Mexico Insurance Code and Violation of the New Mexico Unfair Practices Act against Factory Mutual Insurance Company., filed by Presbyterian Healthcare Services. (Schultz, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Presbyterian Healthcare Services (Schultz, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Presbyterian Healthcare Services of Extension of Briefing Deadlines (Schultz, Andrew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Factory Mutual Insurance Company of Exhibit over 50 Pages (Johnson, Scott)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Casillas Declaration and Policy) (Johnson, Scott)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Ann Ramsey on behalf of Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Ramsey, Erica)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #12 Motion to Vacate Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Continue Initial Case Management Deadlines. The Initial Scheduling Order #7 and the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 are VACATED. The parties shall request a revised Initial Scheduling Order within 14 days of a ruling on the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (smd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Vacate Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Continue Initial Case Management Deadlines by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Johnson, Scott)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 **FILED IN ERROR** MOTION to Dismiss by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration and Policy) (Johnson, Scott) Modified on 10/22/2019 per chambers (meq).
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaars AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505)-348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov.Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/6/2019. (smd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Factory Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, of Removal (Amended) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Wing Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 10, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott G. Johnson on behalf of Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Johnson, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Johnson, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Factory Mutual Insurance Company of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jury Demand, Arbitration Cert, Complaint) (Johnson, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6728948 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Johnson, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Factory Mutual Insurance Company from 2nd Judicial District Court Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-2019-06836. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Wing Declaration ISO Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Presbyterian Healthcare Services v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott G. Johnson
Represented By: Lawrence M Marcus
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Erica Ann Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FM Global
Represented By: Scott G. Johnson
Represented By: Lawrence M Marcus
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: Erica Ann Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Presbyterian Healthcare Services
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?