Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Maria Muniz, Cazam Farms, LLC, Samuel J. Garcia, Cathy Fenner-Garcia and Cathy Fenner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00967
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company re #8 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Extension to File Response (Allen, Meena)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for January 14, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Counsel shall call the toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press # to be joined to the proceedings. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by January 7, 2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than December 30, 2019. (plp)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maria Muniz. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Coronado, Jose)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R. Coronado on behalf of Maria Muniz (Coronado, Jose)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company by Cathy Fenner-Garcia, Cathy Fenner, Samuel J. Garcia, Cazam Farms, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(O'Brien, Daniel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Maria Muniz served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Allen, Meena)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Cazam Farms, LLC served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Allen, Meena)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Cathy Fenner-Garcia served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Allen, Meena)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Cathy Fenner served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Allen, Meena)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Samuel J. Garcia served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Allen, Meena)
October 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Cazam Farms, LLC, Cathy Fenner, Cathy Fenner-Garcia, Samuel J. Garcia, Maria Muniz. (dr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 15, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dr).
October 15, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6735487 re #1 Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Muniz
Represented By: Jose R. Coronado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cazam Farms, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel J. Garcia
Represented By: Daniel J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Fenner-Garcia
Represented By: Daniel J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Fenner
Represented By: Daniel J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?