Jackson National Life Insurance Company v. Urquidez et al
Plaintiff: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Judith Quintana, Gerald Urquidez and Arturo Urquidez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00989
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Judith Quintana served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Ferguson, Kenneth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Gerald Urquidez served on 11/09/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Ferguson, Kenneth) Modified date on 11/18/2019 (bc).
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Interpleader Complaint served on Arturo Urquidez, Jr. on November 4, 2019, filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Kenneth)
October 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Judith Quintana, Arturo Urquidez, and Gerald Urquidez. (aek)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
October 22, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (aek)
October 22, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6752459 re #1 Complaint filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferguson, Kenneth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint FOR INTERPLEADER (Civil Cover Sheet) by Jackson National Life Insurance Company (Ferguson, Kenneth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT (Exhibits) re #1 Complaint FOR INTERPLEADER by Jackson National Life Insurance Company (Ferguson, Kenneth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson National Life Insurance Company v. Urquidez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Urquidez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Urquidez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?