Milam v. Government Employees Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Donavan Milam
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00999
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Perry, Meloney)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Status Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (ccp) Modified docket text on 12/11/2019 (ln).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN (Doc. #9 ) by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (ccp)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 7/8/2020. Motions due by 8/7/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2020. (ccp)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2019. (ccp)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donavan Milam Initial Disclosures (Szantho, Andras)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Government Employees Insurance Company re GEICO's Initial Disclosures (Perry, Meloney)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Perry, Meloney)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Status Report by Government Employees Insurance Company (Perry, Meloney)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Perry, Meloney)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Perry, Meloney)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 12/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 12/3/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/18/2019. (cda)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
October 25, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (aek)
October 25, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6760557 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Perry, Meloney)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Government Employees Insurance Company from 2nd Judicial District Court, Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-2019-07147. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Perry, Meloney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milam v. Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Meloney Cargil Perry
Represented By: Stacy Hemby Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donavan Milam
Represented By: Andras Szantho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?