Valley Improvement Association, et al v. Clarke et al
Plaintiff: Cibola Land Corporation, a New Mexico corporation, Valley Improvement Association, a New Mexico nonprofit corporation, Valley Improvement Association and Cibola Land Corporation
Defendant: Treasurer Desiree Sichler, Director Donna Maestas, Cabinet Secretary Stephanie Schardin Clarke, Donna Maestas, Desiree Sichler and Stephanie Schardin Clarke
Case Number: 1:2019cv01015
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 1/21/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/26/2019. (ccp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Desiree Sichler. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Cibola Land Corporation, Valley Improvement Association.(Macke, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Macke on behalf of Desiree Sichler (Macke, Daniel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Stephanie Schardin Clarke ANSWER to Complaint by Stephanie Schardin Clarke. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Cibola Land Corporation, Valley Improvement Association.(Mittle, David)
November 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aek)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
October 31, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (ln)
October 30, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6771024 re #1 Complaint, filed by Cibola Land Corporation, a New Mexico corporation, Valley Improvement Association, a New Mexico nonprofit corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marrs, Clinton)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cibola Land Corporation, a New Mexico corporation, Valley Improvement Association, a New Mexico nonprofit corporation (Marrs, Clinton)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Enjoin Violations of the United States Constitution and for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Valley Improvement Association, a New Mexico nonprofit corporation, Cibola Land Corporation, a New Mexico corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrs, Clinton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Improvement Association, et al v. Clarke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cibola Land Corporation, a New Mexico corporation
Represented By: Clinton W. Marrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Improvement Association, a New Mexico nonprofit corporation
Represented By: Clinton W. Marrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Improvement Association
Represented By: Clinton W. Marrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cibola Land Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer Desiree Sichler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Donna Maestas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabinet Secretary Stephanie Schardin Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Maestas
Represented By: David E Mittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree Sichler
Represented By: Daniel J Macke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Schardin Clarke
Represented By: David E Mittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?