Poulin Ventures, LLC v. MoneyBunny Co. et al
Plaintiff: Poulin Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Lauren Lee Mitchell, Lauren Scott and MoneyBunny Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01031
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera assigned. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to case. (aek)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lauren Lee Mitchell and MoneyBunny Co. (ln)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk by Poulin Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Non-Military Sevice) (Meyer, Susan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poulin Ventures, LLC. Lauren Lee Mitchell served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Ren, Yan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poulin Ventures, LLC. MoneyBunny Co. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Ren, Yan)
November 27, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6824571 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Pangan, Hazel Mae)
November 27, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6824550 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ren, Yan)
November 27, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6824524 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ren, Yan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Poulin Ventures, LLC by Hazel Mae B Pangan (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Pangan, Hazel Mae)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Poulin Ventures, LLC by Susan B Meyer (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Meyer, Susan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Poulin Ventures, LLC by Yan Ren (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Ren, Yan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Poulin Ventures, LLC Certificate of Good Standing (Meyer) (Ferguson, Kenneth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Poulin Ventures, LLC Certificate of Good Standing (Ren) (Ferguson, Kenneth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Poulin Ventures, LLC Certificate of Good Standing (Pangan) (Ferguson, Kenneth)
November 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Lauren Lee Mitchell, MoneyBunny Co.. (arp)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Report re: patent/trademark/copyright with docket sheet, Complaint with exhibits mailed to Mail Stop 8. (ln)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Poulin Ventures, LLC re #1 Complaint AO 120 (Ferguson, Kenneth)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (ln)
November 6, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6783972 re #1 Complaint filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferguson, Kenneth)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mitchell Lee a.k.a. Laur Lauren, MoneyBunny Co. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferguson, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poulin Ventures, LLC v. MoneyBunny Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Lee Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoneyBunny Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poulin Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Represented By: Hazel Mae B Pangan
Represented By: Yan Ren
Represented By: Susan B Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?