M.P. v. Reveles et al
Plaintiff: M.P.
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo, Julie Morgas Baca and Johnny Reveles
Case Number: 1:2019cv01032
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
2 Judge: William P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RESETTING HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The #8 Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing, originally set for 1/28/2020, is hereby RESET to 2/4/2020 at 10:00 AM. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 1/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/2/2020. (gbg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 County Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Civil Rights Violations by Julie Morgas Baca, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo. (Apodaca, Frank)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal of State Court Documents Notice of Filing of Record Before the Second Judicial District Court by Julie Morgas Baca, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summonses with Returns of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Non-Arbitration, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Apodaca, Frank)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Julie Morgas Baca, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo, Johnny Reveles (Apodaca, Frank)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnny Reveles. (Macke, Daniel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Macke on behalf of Johnny Reveles (Macke, Daniel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (ln)
November 6, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6784371 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Julie Morgas Baca, Johnny Reveles, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Frank)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-07721. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summonses with Returns of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Apodaca, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.P. v. Reveles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.P.
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Represented By: Shannon L Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Daniel C. Apodaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Morgas Baca
Represented By: Frank T Apodaca
Represented By: Daniel C. Apodaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Reveles
Represented By: Daniel J Macke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?