Tafoya v. Rasier, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christine Tafoya
Defendant: James River Insurance Company, Rasier, LLC, Rasier and Gabreil Munoz
Case Number: 1:2019cv01035
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand Notice of Joinder filed by Rasier. (Nieman, Nathan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand filed by James River Insurance Company. (Goodman, Justin)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (khs)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand by Christine Tafoya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nelson, Amelia)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan T Nieman on behalf of Rasier (Nieman, Nathan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by James River Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal Request for Judicial Notice Supporting Notice of Removal (Goodman, Justin)
November 7, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6785744 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by James River Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goodman, Justin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
November 7, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (aek)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by James River Insurance Company (Goodman, Justin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James River Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-03116. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by James River Insurance Company. (Goodman, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tafoya v. Rasier, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Tafoya
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Dayan M Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin D Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier
Represented By: Tim L Fields
Represented By: Nathan T Nieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabreil Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?